EP1045916 - ENZYMATIC CONVERSION OF GDP-MANNOSE TO GDP-FUCOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neose Technologies, Inc. 102 Witmer Road Horsham, PA 19044 / US | [2002/34] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states CYTEL CORPORATION 9393 Towne Centre Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SJOBERG, Eric, R. 12639 Crest Knolls Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99903116.4 | 15.01.1999 | [2000/43] | WO1999US00893 | Priority number, date | USP 71076 | 15.01.1998 | USA 231905 | 14.01.1999 | [2001/05] |
Former [2001/05] | US19980071076P | 15.01.1998 | |
[2000/43] | 08.09.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | USP 71076 | 15.01.1998 | |
USA | 14.01.1999 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9936555 | Date: | 22.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045916 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1045916 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/70, C12N15/61, C12N15/53, C12P19/32, C12P19/18, C12N9/02, C12N9/90 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
C12N9/0008 (EP,US);
C12N9/90 (EP,US);
C12P19/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | ENZYMATISCHE UMWANDLUNG VON GDP-MANNOSE IN GDP-FUCOSE | [2000/43] | English: | ENZYMATIC CONVERSION OF GDP-MANNOSE TO GDP-FUCOSE | [2000/43] | French: | CONVERSION ENZYMATIQUE DE GDP-MANNOSE EN GDP-FUCOSE | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 18.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Request for further processing for: | 08.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 08.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.09.2008 | BE | 17.09.2008 | CY | 17.09.2008 | DK | 17.09.2008 | FI | 17.09.2008 | IT | 17.09.2008 | NL | 17.09.2008 | SE | 17.12.2008 | GR | 18.12.2008 | ES | 28.12.2008 | GB | 15.01.2009 | IE | 15.01.2009 | LU | 15.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | FR | 02.02.2009 | PT | 17.02.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
GR | 18.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
GB | 15.01.2009 | ||
IE | 15.01.2009 | ||
LU | 15.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
GB | 15.01.2009 | ||
IE | 15.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
SE | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
GB | 15.01.2009 | ||
IE | 15.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
GB | 15.01.2009 | ||
IE | 15.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
DK | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
IT | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
GB | 15.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
NL | 17.09.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
PT | 17.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
ES | 28.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
BE | 17.09.2008 | ||
FI | 17.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 17.09.2008 | |
FI | 17.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XD] - STEVENSON G ET AL, "Organization of the Escherichia coli K-12 gene cluster responsible for production of the extracellular polysaccharide colanic acid", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (199608), vol. 178, no. 16, pages 4885 - 4893, XP002105558 [XD] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * page 4889, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [XD] - TONETTI M ET AL, "Synthesis of GDP-L-fucose by the human FX protein", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19961101), vol. 271, no. 44, pages 27274 - 27279, XP002105559 [XD] 1-17,38-43 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.44.27274 | [PX] - SULLIVAN F X ET AL, "Molecular cloning of human gdp-mannose 4,6-dehydratase and reconstitution of GDP-fucose biosynthesis in vitro", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19980403), vol. 273, no. 14, pages 8193 - 8202, XP002105560 [PX] 1-17,38-43 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.14.8193 | [PX] - ANDRIANOPOULOS K ET AL, "Identification of the fucose synthetase gene in the colanic acid gene cluster of Escherichia coli K-12", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (199802), vol. 180, no. 4, pages 998 - 1001, XP002105561 [PX] 1-17,38-43 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * |