EP1055218 - HIGH RESOLUTION ACTIVE MATRIX DISPLAY SYSTEM ON A CHIP WITH HIGH DUTY CYCLE FOR FULL BRIGHTNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FED CORPORATION 1580 Route 52, Hudson Valley Research Park Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states FED CORPORATION 1580 Route 52, Hudson Valley Research Park Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRACHE, Olivier, F. 213 Manville Road Pleasantville, NY 10570 / US | 02 /
HOWARD, Webster, E. 4 Lee Lane Lagrangeville, NY 12540 / US | 03 /
MALAVIYA, Shashi 5 Orbit Lane Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 / US | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99903238.6 | 22.01.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999US01223 | Priority number, date | US19980072342P | 23.01.1998 Original published format: US 72342 P | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9938148 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1055218 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
G09G3/2014 (EP);
G09G3/2018 (EP);
G09G3/3233 (EP);
G09G3/325 (EP);
G09G3/3258 (EP);
G09G3/3283 (EP);
G09G3/3291 (EP);
G09G2300/0809 (EP);
G09G2300/0842 (EP);
G09G2300/0861 (EP);
G09G2310/0248 (EP);
G09G2310/0256 (EP);
G09G2310/0259 (EP);
G09G2310/027 (EP);
G09G2310/066 (EP);
G09G2320/0223 (EP);
G09G2320/0233 (EP);
G09G2320/0285 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/48] | Title | German: | HOCHAUFLÖSENDES FLÜSSIGKEITS-KRISTALL-ANZEIGESYSTEM AUF EINEM CHIP MIT HOHEM TASTVERHÄLTNIS FÜR MAXIMALE HELLIGKEIT | [2000/48] | English: | HIGH RESOLUTION ACTIVE MATRIX DISPLAY SYSTEM ON A CHIP WITH HIGH DUTY CYCLE FOR FULL BRIGHTNESS | [2000/48] | French: | SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE HAUTE RESOLUTION A MATRICE ACTIVE QUI EST MONTE SUR PUCE, POSSEDE UN COEFFICIENT D'UTILISATION ELEVE ET PERMET D'ASSURER UNE LUMINOSITE MAXIMALE | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 07.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/12] | 26.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5017914 ; | [Y]US5589847 ; | [Y]US5339090 ; | [Y]US4872002 ; | [Y]US4691200 |