EP1078318 - A SECURE DATABASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR CONFIDENTIAL RECORDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ho, Andrew P. 627 North Maple Drive Beverly Hills, CA 90210 / US | [2001/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99903299.8 | 21.01.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US01366 | Priority number, date | US19980072740P | 27.01.1998 Original published format: US 72740 P | US19990229694 | 13.01.1999 Original published format: US 229694 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9938080 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078318 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, H04L9/32, G06F1/00 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
G06F21/6245 (EP,US);
G06F2211/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/09] | G06F13/00, H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | EIN SICHERES DATEIENMANAGEMENT-SYSTEM FÜR VERTRAULICHE INFORMATIONEN | [2001/09] | English: | A SECURE DATABASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR CONFIDENTIAL RECORDS | [2001/09] | French: | SYSTEME DE GESTION D'UNE BASE DE DONNEES PROTEGEE CONTENANT DES INFORMATIONS CONFIDENTIELLES | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 03.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/35] | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.2003 | 31.01.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.2005 | 31.01.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5511122 (ATKINSON RANDALL [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 6, line 11 - line 24 * * column 9, line 1 - line 40 * * column 10, line 19 - column 11, line 66 * * column 12, line 55 - column 13, line 7 * * figure 4 *; | [A]JPH09146844 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | US5822518 [ ] (OOKI MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 52 ** figure 6 * | International search | [A]US5202921 (HERZBERG AMIR [IL], et al); | [X]US5539824 (BJORKLUND RONALD E [FR], et al); | [AE]US5864683 (BOEBERT WILLIAM E [US], et al) |