EP1056548 - FUNCTIONALIZED POROUS SILICON SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purdue Research Foundation 1021 Hovde Hall (Room 307) West Lafayette, IN 47907-1021 / US | [2008/42] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION 1021 Hovde Hall (Room 307) West Lafayette, IN 47907-1021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURIAK, Jillian, M. 4139 W. 150 N. West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99903326.9 | 22.01.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999US01428 | Priority number, date | US19980072216P | 22.01.1998 Original published format: US 72216 P | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937409 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1056548 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1056548 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B05D3/04, C12Q1/68 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/552 (EP,US);
B05D1/185 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/49] | Extension states | AL | 21.08.2000 | LT | 21.08.2000 | LV | 21.08.2000 | MK | 21.08.2000 | RO | 21.08.2000 | SI | 21.08.2000 | Title | German: | FUNKTIONALISIERTE PORÖSE SILIZIUMOBERFLÄCHEN | [2000/49] | English: | FUNCTIONALIZED POROUS SILICON SURFACES | [2000/49] | French: | SURFACES DE SILICIUM POREUSES ET FONCTIONNALISEES | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.08.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 03.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 03.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.10.2008 | BE | 15.10.2008 | CY | 15.10.2008 | DK | 15.10.2008 | FI | 15.10.2008 | IT | 15.10.2008 | NL | 15.10.2008 | SE | 15.01.2009 | GR | 16.01.2009 | IE | 22.01.2009 | LU | 22.01.2009 | ES | 26.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | FR | 02.02.2009 | PT | 16.03.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
IE | 22.01.2009 | ||
LU | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
IE | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
IE | 22.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 26.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5429708 (LINFORD MATTHEW B [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 5, line 17 - line 34; claims 19,23,24 *; | [A]US5620850 (BAMDAD CYNTHIA C [US], et al) [A] 1,9* column 10, line 7 - line 31 *; | [E]EP0911088 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE]) [E] 1,9 * figure 1; example 1; table 1 *; | [E]WO0026019 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al) [E] 1,9 * figure 1; claim - *; | [PX] - BURIAK J M ET AL, "LEWIS ACID MEDIATED FUNCTIONALIZATION OF POROUS SILICON WITH SUBSTITUTED ALKENES AND ALKYNES", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199802), vol. 120, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 1339 - 1340, XP002920673 [PX] 1,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja9740125 | International search | [X]US4735906 (BASTIAANS GLENN J [US], et al); | [XP] - BURIAK J. M., ALLEN M. J., "LEWIS ACID MEDIATED FUNCTIONALIZATION OF POROUS SILICON WITH SUBSTITUTED ALKENES AND ALKYNES.", Journal of the American Chemical Society, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19980201), vol. 120., doi:10.1021/ja9740125, ISSN 0002-7863, page 1339/1340., XP002920673 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja9740125 | [X] - LIN V. S.-Y., ET AL., "A POROUS SILICON-BASED OPTICAL INTERFEROMETRIC BIOSENSOR.", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19971031), vol. 278., doi:10.1126/science.278.5339.840, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 840 - 843., XP002920674 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.278.5339.840 |