EP1051106 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TISSUE MODULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lightouch Medical, Inc. 2501 Woodland Road PO Box 531 Bryn Athyn, PA 19009 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states Lightouch Medical, Inc. 2501 Woodland Road PO Box 531 Bryn Athyn, PA 19009 / US | ||
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states Lightouch Medical, Inc. 6249 Ingham Road New Hope, PA 18938 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAIKEN, Joseph 302 Edwards Drive Fayetteville, NY 13066 / US | 02 /
PETERSON, Charles, M. 11920 Glen Mill Road Potomac, MD 20854 / US | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99904315.1 | 27.01.1999 | [2000/46] | WO1999US01704 | Priority number, date | US19980072710P | 27.01.1998 Original published format: US 72710 P | US19980072658P | 27.01.1998 Original published format: US 72658 P | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937205 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1051106 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1051106 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/024, A61B5/00 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
A61B5/14552 (EP,US);
A61B5/0053 (EP,US);
A61B5/02427 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION VON GEWEBE | [2000/46] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TISSUE MODULATION | [2000/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA MODULATION TISSULAIRE | [2000/46] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 20.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2004 | BE | 15.09.2004 | CH | 15.09.2004 | FI | 15.09.2004 | LI | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | SE | 15.12.2004 | CY | 27.01.2005 | IE | 27.01.2005 | LU | 27.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | PT | 15.02.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/21] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CY | 27.01.2005 | ||
IE | 27.01.2005 | ||
LU | 27.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 27.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 15.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1909882 (BATTELLE INSTITUT E V) [A] 1,2,4,18,27 * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 15 * * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 2; claim 3 *; | [A]WO9300856 (VIVASCAN CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,27,31,33-35* page 6, line 25 - page 8, line 25 *; | [A]WO9312712 (VIVASCAN CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,27,31,33-35 * page 10, line 11 - page 11, line 7 *; | [A]EP0573137 (ALZA CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,4,18,27 * column 11, line 4 - line 19 *; | [A]WO9410901 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,4,14,18-20,27 * page 35, line 5 - line 13; figure 12 * * page 45, line 25 - page 46, line 23 *; | [DA]US5551422 (SIMONSEN JAN H [DK], et al) [DA] 1,3,4,14,18-20,27 | by applicant | US5551422 | US5553616 | US5615673 | - S.Y. WANG ET AL., "Analysis of metabolites in aqueous solution by using laser Raman spectroscopy.", APPLIED OPTICS, (1993), vol. 32, no. 6, pages 925 - 929 | - A.J. BERGER ET AL., "Rapid, noninvasive concentration measurements of aqueous biological analytes by near infrared Raman spectroscopy.", APPLIED OPTICS, (1996), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 209 - 212 | - R.R. ANDERSON AND J. PARRISH, "The optics of Human Skin.", J. INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (1981), vol. 77, no. 1, pages 13 - 19 |