EP1082423 - CYCLIN E2 GENES AND PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMGEN INC. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [2005/46] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COATS, Steven, Roy 2433 Balmoral Court Camarillo, CA 93010-3404 / US | 02 /
BASS, Michael, Brian 1743 North Marian Avenue Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 03 /
ROBINSON, Murray, O. 974 Las Lomas Avenue Pacific Palisades, California 90272 / US | [2005/22] |
Former [2001/16] | 01 /
COATS, Steven, Roy 2433 Balmoral Court Camarillo, CA 93010-3404 / US | ||
02 /
BASS, Michael, Brian 1743 North Marian Avenue Thousand Oaks, CA 91362 / US | |||
03 /
ROBINSON, Murray, O. 974 Las Lomas Avenue Pacific Palisades, California 90272 / US | |||
Former [2001/11] | 01 /
COATS, Steven, Roy 2433 Balmoral Court Camarillo, CA 93010-3404 / US | ||
02 /
BASS, Michael, Brian 2208 Rustic Park Court Thousand Oaks, CA 91362 / US | |||
03 /
ROBINSON, Murray, O. 22623 Pacific Coast Highway Malibu, CA 90265 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99904337.5 | 28.01.1999 | [2001/11] | WO1999US01737 | Priority number, date | US19980092770 | 05.06.1998 Original published format: US 92770 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9963089 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1082423 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1082423 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/11, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, C12Q1/68, A61K48/00 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
C12Q1/485 (EP,US);
C07K14/4738 (EP,US);
G01N33/573 (EP,US);
G01N33/57407 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
G01N2333/91215 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] | Extension states | AL | 05.12.2000 | LT | 05.12.2000 | LV | 05.12.2000 | MK | 05.12.2000 | RO | 05.12.2000 | SI | 05.12.2000 | Title | German: | CYCLIN-E2 PROTEINE UND DAFÜR KODIERENDE GENE | [2001/11] | English: | CYCLIN E2 GENES AND PROTEINS | [2001/11] | French: | GENES ET PROTEINES CYCLINE E1 | [2001/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 18.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XLO] - AMATI B, "A NEW G1-SPECIFIC CYCLIN IN MAMMALIAN CELLS", URL: http://nucelus.cshl.org/meetings/_archive/1998/98path_absstat.html, (19990715), XP002109659 [XLO] 1-19 * L: presumed to have the same content as XP002109553. Abstract cited in the application.; page 2, line AMATI * | [XL] - ZARIWALA M B, "HUMAN CYCLIN E2 REPRESENTS A NEW NOVEL E-TYPE CYCLIN", URL: http://nucleus.cshl.org/meetings/_archive/1998/98path_absstat.html, (19990715), XP002109658 [XL] 1-16 * L: presumed to have the same content as XP002109551. Abstract cited in the application.; page 3, line ZARIWALA * | [X] - HILLIER ET AL., "The WashU-Merck EST Project", EMBL ON STRAND, (19970613), XP002109555 [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * page 1, line 11 * * the whole document * | [DX] - HILLIER ET AL., "The WashU-Merck EST Project", EMBL ON STRAND, (19960813), XP002109554 [DX] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * the whole document * | [X] - STRAUSBERG, "NCI Cancer Genome Anatomy Project (NCICGAP)", EMBL ON STRAND, (19970616), XP002109556 [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * the whole document * | [A] - KEYOMARSI ET AL., "The role of cyclin E in cell proliferation, development and cancer", PROG. CELL CYCLE RES., (1997), vol. 3, pages 171 - 191, XP002109550 [A] 1,15 * the whole document * | [PX] - LAUPER N ET AL, "Cyclin E2: a novel CDK2 partner in the late G1 and S phases of the mammalian cell cycle.", ONCOGENE, (1998 NOV 19) 17 (20) 2637-43, XP002109553 [PX] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1202477 | [PX] - ZARIWALA M ET AL, "Cyclin E2, a novel human G1 cyclin and activating partner of CDK2 and CDK3, is induced by viral oncoproteins.", ONCOGENE, (1998 NOV 26) 17 (21) 2787-2798, XP002109551 [PX] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1202505 | [PX] - GUDAS J M ET AL, "Cyclin E2, a novel G1 cyclin that binds Cdk2 and is aberrantly expressed in human cancers.", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1999 JAN) 19 (1) 612-622, XP002109552 [PX] 1-19 * the whole document * |