EP1049984 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CLIENT-SERVER INTERACTION IN INTERACTIVE COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York Broadway and West 116th Street New York, NY 10027-6699 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York Broadway and West 116th Street New York, NY 10027-6699 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalva, Hari Apt.8G 542 W 112th Street New York, NY 10025 / US | 02 /
ELEFTHERIADIS, Alexandros Apartment 42 560 Riverside Drive New York, NY 10027 / US | [2001/04] |
Former [2000/45] | 01 /
KALVA, Hari Apartment 8E 419 West 119th Street New York, NY 10027 / US | ||
02 /
ELEFTHERIADIS, Alexandros Apartment 42 560 Riverside Drive New York, NY 10027 / US | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99904489.4 | 29.01.1999 | [2000/45] | WO1999US02063 | Priority number, date | US19980073203P | 30.01.1998 Original published format: US 73203 P | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9939272 | Date: | 05.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1049984 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, G06F13/14, H04N7/24 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
H04N21/6587 (EP);
G06F13/14 (KR);
H04N21/23412 (EP);
H04N21/44012 (EP);
H04N21/47205 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/45] | G06F13/00, G06F13/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR KUNDENSERVER-INTERAKTION IN INTERAKTIVEN KOMMUNIKATIONEN | [2000/45] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CLIENT-SERVER INTERACTION IN INTERACTIVE COMMUNICATIONS | [2000/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'INTERACTION ENTRE CLIENT ET SERVEUR DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS INTERACTIVES | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 19.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 17.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/30] | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5621892 (COOK COLIN [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-9,11-14 * column 4, line 10 - line 49 * * column 5, line 3 - line 59 * [A] 3,10; | [A]US5671225 (HOOPER DONALD F [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 10 - line 20 * * column 5, line 8 - line 29 * * figure 2 * | [PX] - A. ELEFTHERIADIS, H. KALVA, "Use of CommandDescriptor and CommandROUTES to Support User Interaction", INTERNATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR STANDARDIZATION ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 (M3506), (19980313), URL: http://mpeg.telecomitalialab.com, (20030718), XP002248351 [PX] 1-14 * the whole document * | [YA] - ELEFTHEDIADIS A ET AL, "TEXT FOR CD 14496-1 SYSTEMS", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 N1901, XX, XX, (19971121), pages 1,I - XV,1-206, XP001014301 [Y] 1,2,4-9,11-14 * page 4, line 1 - line 21 * * paragraph [7.2.2.17.1] * * paragraph [7.2.3.1.12] * [A] 3,10 | [A] - H. KALVA, A. ELEFTHERIADIS, "MPEG-4 Interaction Model and Required Normative Support", INTERNATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR STANDARDIZATION ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 (M2888), (19971021), URL: http://mpeg.telecomitalialab.com, (20030718), XP002248352 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5621892 (COOK COLIN [US]); | [X]US5671225 (HOOPER DONALD F [US], et al); | [XP]US5754784 (GARLAND J DAVID [US], et al); | [XP]US5790124 (FISCHER RONALD ALBERT [US], et al); | [YP]US5784567 (SAGER GARY R [US], et al); | [A]US5706290 (SHAW VENSON [US], et al); | [A]US5864843 (CARINO JR FELIPE [US], et al); | [A]US5794250 (CARINO JR FELIPE [US], et al); | [A]US5880720 (IWAFUNE SEIJI [JP], et al); | [A]US5818935 (MAA CHIA-YIU [US]); | [A]US5850218 (LAJOIE MIKE L [US], et al); | [A]US5805804 (LAURSEN ANDREW [US], et al); | [A]US5892915 (DUSO WAYNE W [US], et al) | [Y] - TAMPERE UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY FINLAND, "VIDEO ON DEMAND", URL: HTTP://WWW.CS.TUT.FI/TLT/STUFF/VOD/VODOVERVIEW/VOD.HTML, (19990407), XP002918754 | [Y] - RAJAPAKSHE H, QUEK D P, "VIDEO ON DEMAND", IEE COLLOQUIUM ON HIGH SPEED ACCESS TECHNOLOGY AND SERVICES,INCLUDING VIDEO-ON-DEMAND, IEE, LONDON., GB, GB, (19950601), vol. 04, page COMPLETE, XP002918755 |