EP0991522 - PRINTED DOCUMENT HAVING A VALUE AND COMPRISING A LUMINESCENT AUTHENTICITY FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, IT, LI, LU | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAULE, Wittich, Dr. Lindacher Weg 13 82275 Emmering / DE | 02 /
SCHWENK, Gerhard, Dr. Primelstrasse 106 82178 Puchheim / DE | 03 /
STENZEL, Gerhard, Dr. Fichtenstrasse 88 82110 Germering / DE | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99904827.5 | 29.01.1999 | [2000/15] | WO1999EP00595 | Priority number, date | DE1998104032 | 02.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19804032 | [2000/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9938702 | Date: | 05.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991522 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991522 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41M3/14, B42D15/00, B42D15/10, G07D7/00, G06K19/14, G09F3/00 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
B41M3/144 (EP,US);
B42D25/29 (EP,US);
C09K11/7701 (EP,US);
C09K11/7708 (EP,US);
C09K11/7769 (EP,US);
C09K11/7774 (EP,US);
C09K11/7776 (EP,US);
Y10S283/901 (EP,US);
Y10S283/904 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Extension states | SI | 02.11.1999 | Title | German: | BEDRUCKTES WERTDOKUMENT MIT EINEM LUMINESZIERENDEN ECHTHEITSMERKMAL | [2000/15] | English: | PRINTED DOCUMENT HAVING A VALUE AND COMPRISING A LUMINESCENT AUTHENTICITY FEATURE | [2000/15] | French: | DOCUMENT DE VALEUR IMPRIME COMPORTANT UNE CARACTERISTIQUE D'AUTHENTICITE LUMINESCENTE | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 04.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.02.2005
23.02.2005
ADMISSIBLE Bundesdruckerei GmbH Oranienstr. 91 10958 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Engel, Christoph Klaus PATENTSCHUTZengel Marktplatz 6 98527 Suhl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.02.2005
23.02.2005
ADMISSIBLE Bundesdruckerei GmbH Oranienstr. 91 10958 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Engel, Christoph Klaus Engel Patentanwaltskanzlei Marktplatz 6 98527 Suhl/Thüringen / DE | ||
Former [2005/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.02.2005
23.02.2005
ADMISSIBLE Dr.-Ing.h.c.F.Porsche AG Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Engel, Christoph Klaus Engel Patentanwaltskanzlei Marktplatz 6 98527 Suhl/Thüringen / DE | 07.04.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.08.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.02.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/20] | Appeal following opposition | 31.07.2007 | Appeal received No. T1313/07 | 13.11.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.02.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 11.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.02.2010 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 06.05.2004 | LI | 06.05.2004 | CY | 29.01.2005 | FI | 29.01.2005 | IE | 31.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | GR | 02.08.2005 | IT | 29.01.2009 | LU | 29.01.2009 | BE | 31.01.2009 | PT | 29.07.2009 | DK | 31.07.2009 | NL | 01.08.2009 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/44] | CY | 29.01.2005 | |
FI | 29.01.2005 | ||
IE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 02.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 31.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 29.01.2005 | |
FI | 29.01.2005 | ||
IE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 02.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | CY | 29.01.2005 | |
FI | 29.01.2005 | ||
IE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 02.08.2005 | ||
PT | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.08.2009 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CY | 29.01.2005 | |
FI | 29.01.2005 | ||
IE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 02.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 29.01.2005 | |
IE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 02.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 29.01.2005 | |
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 02.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 29.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8103507 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE], et al) [X] 1-28 * page 1, line 4 - line 10 * * page 8, line 11 - page 12, line 9; examples 4,6,7 * * claims 1-3,11,23-25 *; | [A]WO8103510 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE], et al) [A] 1-28 * page 1, line 5 - line 16 * * page 6, line 22 - line 28 * * page 9, line 7 - line 15 * * page 14, line 10 - page 16, line 17; claims 1,2,13-19,25-32 *; | [A]FR2554122 (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]) [A] 1-28 * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 3, line 12 - line 27 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 3; claims 1,16,20-24,33,34 * * page 12, line 30 - page 14, line 25 *; | [A]FR2556867 (JALON MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1-28* example 1; claims 1,5 * |