EP1051083 - LOW-BROWNING CRUMB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kerry Ingredients (UK) Limited Thorpe Lea Manor, Thorpe Lea Road Egham Surrey TW20 8HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states Kerry Ingredients (UK) Limited Thorpe Lea Manor, Thorpe Lea Road Egham, Surrey TW20 8HY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FROST, Matthew, Jonathan No. 2 Newark Close, Thorpe St. Andrew Norwich NR7 0YJ / GB | 02 /
GODDARD, Simon, James 7 Woodcock Close, Impington Cambs CB4 9LD / GB | 03 /
HOWARD, Julie, Ann 1 Ganwick Close, Haverhill Suffolk CB9 9JX / GB | 04 /
ATKINSON, Jane, Louise Flat 49, Feddon Village, Nore Road, Postishead Bristol, Somerset BS20 8EJ / GB | 05 /
DOBSON, Adrian, Robert 15 Barrie Grove, Hellaby, Rotherham South Yorkshire S66 8HG / GB | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Duffy, Assumpta Dympna, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Duffy, Assumpta Dympna, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2004/36] | Duffy, Assumpta Dympna, et al F. R. Kelly & Co., 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2004/35] | Kelly, Peter F., et al F. R. Kelly & Co., 27 Clyde Road, Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2000/46] | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99904946.3 | 26.01.1999 | [2000/46] | WO1999GB00095 | Priority number, date | GB19980001890 | 30.01.1998 Original published format: GB 9801890 | GB19980025840 | 26.11.1998 Original published format: GB 9825840 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9938391 | Date: | 05.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1051083 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1051083 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/176, A21D13/00, A21D10/00 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
A21D13/064 (EP,US);
A21D10/00 (EP,US);
A21D13/46 (EP,US);
A23L7/157 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Extension states | AL | 30.08.2000 | LT | 30.08.2000 | LV | 30.08.2000 | MK | 30.08.2000 | RO | 30.08.2000 | SI | 30.08.2000 | Title | German: | PANIERMEHL MIT GERINGER BRÄUNUNG | [2004/23] | English: | LOW-BROWNING CRUMB | [2000/46] | French: | MIE A FAIBLE BRUNISSEMENT | [2000/46] |
Former [2000/46] | GERINGE BRAÜNUNG PANIERMEHL | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 04.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.02.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2004 | BE | 03.11.2004 | CH | 03.11.2004 | FI | 03.11.2004 | IT | 03.11.2004 | LI | 03.11.2004 | CY | 26.01.2005 | LU | 26.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | DK | 03.02.2005 | GR | 03.02.2005 | SE | 03.02.2005 | ES | 14.02.2005 | PT | 03.04.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/21] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
CY | 26.01.2005 | ||
LU | 26.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
BE | 03.11.2004 | ||
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 03.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3486904 (ZIEGLER JOHN A) [A] 1,24 * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 3 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US4297378 (HAASL MICHAEL J, et al) [A] 1,3-7,9,10,12,16,18-22,25-27 * column 2, line 22 - line 54 * * column 3, line 18 - line 28 * * column 5, line 45 - line 53 * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 23 *; | [Y]GB2099277 (MODERN MAID FOOD PRODUCTS INC) [Y] 1,3-7,11-13,15,16,18-27 * page 2, line 29 - line 79 * * example I; table I * * claims 1-8 *; | [Y]FR2588159 (SCHENEDER LEONARD [FR]) [Y] 1,3-7,11-13,15,16,18-27 * page 2, line 10 - line 15 * * example 1 * * claims 1,2,5,6 *; | [A]US4904493 (PETRIZZELLI GAETANO [FR]) [A] 5,9 * column 2, line 25 - line 48 ** claim 1 *; | [A]EP0480433 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [A] 1,23,24 * example 13 * |