EP1055286 - METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING RANDOM NUMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEA Technology plc 329 Harwell Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 0QJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states AEA Technology plc 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0QJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Amersham plc The Grove Centre, White Lion Road Amersham, Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB | ||
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states Nycomed Amersham plc Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHILTON, Mark, Golder 1 Warwick Close Aston Clinton Buckinghamshire HP22 5JF / GB | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Perkins, Sarah Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Perkins, Sarah Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99905030.5 | 12.02.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999GB00443 | Priority number, date | GB19980003055 | 12.02.1998 Original published format: GB 9803055 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9941834 | Date: | 19.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1055286 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03K3/84 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
H03K3/84 (EP,US);
G06F7/588 (EP,US);
H04L9/0662 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ZUFALLSZAHLEN | [2000/48] | English: | METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING RANDOM NUMBERS | [2000/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA GENERATION DE NOMBRES ALEATOIRES | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 21.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/46] | 21.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 05.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/49] | Request for further processing for: | 16.12.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]JPH06154411 ; | [YP]WO9806175 (AMERSHAM INT PLC [GB], et al) [YP] 3,7 * figure 1 *; | [XP]WO9833075 (SAGE TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [XP] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * figure 3 *; | [XY] - J. VON NEUMANN (SUMMARY BY G. FORSYTHE), "Various Techniques Used in Connection With Random Digits", VON NEUMANN'S COLLECTED WORKS, (1963), vol. 5, pages 768 - 770, XP002103231 [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * see page 768, paragraph 2 REPRINTED FROM * [Y] 3,7 | [ ] - JOURNAL OF RESEARCH OF THE NATIONAL BUREAU OF STANDARDS, APPLIED MATH SERIES, (1951), vol. 3, pages 36 - 38 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940906), vol. 018, no. 476, Database accession no. (C - 1246), & JP06154411 A 19940603 (OKUMURA YUKI KK) [AD] 4,8-10 * abstract * |