EP0978819 - IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIWARA, Shuichi Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
AKAIWA, Shoichi Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 99905303.6 | 24.02.1999 | [2000/06] | WO1999JP00863 | Priority number, date | JP19980046045 | 26.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4604598 | [2000/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944190 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978819 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978819 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
G09G5/005 (EP,US);
G09G5/00 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0407 (EP,US);
G09G2360/02 (EP,US);
G09G2370/04 (EP,US);
G09G5/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/06] | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGEGERÄT | [2000/06] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2000/06] | French: | APPAREIL DE VISUALISATION D'IMAGES | [2000/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1999 | Translation filed | 24.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 24.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.09.2006 | 29.08.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH06245164 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONIC); | [X]JPH064791U ; | [X]JPH04125684 (TOTOKU ELECTRIC, et al); | [X]JPH1055158 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONIC); | [Y]JPH03280084 (SEIKO INSTR INC); | [Y]JPH08328523 (PENTEL KK) | Examination | DE3722169 | US5031118 |