EP1053024 - LIPOSOME FUSION AND DELIVERY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Longmuir, Kenneth J. 8 Gibbs Court Irvine, CA 92612 / US | For all designated states Waring, Alan J. 12 Melody Lane Irvine, CA 92614 / US | For all designated states Haynes, Sherry, M. 16 Seton Road Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2000/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Harrison Goddard Foote Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99905726.8 | 04.02.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999US02410 | Priority number, date | US19980019346 | 05.02.1998 Original published format: US 19346 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9939742 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053024 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C12N15/00 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/1271 (EP,US);
C07K14/785 (EP,US);
C12N15/88 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | LIPOSOMENFUSION UND VERABREICHUNGSTRÄGER | [2000/47] | English: | LIPOSOME FUSION AND DELIVERY VEHICLE | [2000/47] | French: | FUSION DE LIPOSOME ET VEHICULE D'ADMINISTRATION | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 31.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/13] | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4873089 (SCOTTO ANTHONY W [US], et al); | [Y]US5149782 (CHANG TSE-WEN [US], et al); | [Y]WO9640958 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US]); | [Y]US5614503 (CHAUDHARY NILABH [US], et al); | [AP]US5744335 (WOLFF JON A [US], et al); | [Y] - BONGARTZ J-P, ET AL., "IMPROVED BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY OF ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDES CONJUGATED TO A FUSOGENIC PEPTIDE", Nucleic Acids Research, Information Retrieval Ltd., GB, GB, (19940101), vol. 22, no. 22, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4681 - 4688, XP002918789 | [Y] - PUYAL C, ET AL., "DESIGN OF A SHORT MEMBRANE-DESTABILIZING PEPTIDE COVALENTLY BOUND TO LIPOSOMES", Biochimica et Biophysica Acta (BBA) - Biomembranes, Elsevier, AMSTERDAM, NL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19940101), vol. 1195, doi:10.1016/0005-2736(94)90265-8, ISSN 0005-2736, pages 259 - 266, XP002918790 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2736(94)90265-8 |