EP1054724 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF PRODUCING LIQUID DISPERSE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Five Star Technologies, Inc. 21200 Aerospace Parkway Cleveland Ohio 44142 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states Five Star Technologies, Inc. 21200 Aerospace Parkway Cleveland, Ohio 44142 / US | ||
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states Kozyuk, Oleg Vyacheslavovich 14600 Brookpark Road Cleveland, OH 44135 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kozyuk, Oleg Vyacheslavovich 27688 Westchester Parkway Apt. A Westlake, OH 44145 / US | [2003/35] |
Former [2000/48] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Freischem, Stephan Freischem & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Salierring 47-53 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Freischem, Stephan, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Freischem An Gross St. Martin 2 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99905779.7 | 05.02.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999US02516 | Priority number, date | US19980019823 | 06.02.1998 Original published format: US 19823 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9939813 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1054724 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1054724 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/08 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
B01F23/4105 (EP,US);
B01F25/4413 (EP,US);
B01F25/42 (EP,US);
B01F25/45 (EP,US);
B01F25/4521 (EP,US);
B01F33/834 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON FLÜSSIGDISPERSEN SYSTEMEN IN FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2000/48] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS OF PRODUCING LIQUID DISPERSE SYSTEMS | [2000/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR L'OBTENTION DE SYSTEMES DE DISPERSION LIQUIDE | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9730292 (KOZYUK OLEG VYACHESLAVOVICH [US]) [X] 1-12 * see the whole document and in particular example 4 *; | [X]WO9730956 (KOZYUK OLEG VYACHESLAVOVICH [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8301210 (PATTERSON WILLIAM P, et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0322097 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0644271 (KOZJUK OLEG VYACHESLAVOVICH [UA], et al) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document * |