EP1056605 - TYRE TOP REINFORCEMENT PLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN-MICHELIN & CIE 12, Cours Sablon 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN-MICHELIN & CIE 12, Cours Sablon 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIRAUD, Jacques 11, rue de l'Artière F-63110 Beaumont / FR | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Diernaz, Christian Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Diernaz, Christian Michelin & Cie Service SGD/LG/PI-LAD 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99906228.4 | 12.02.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999EP00908 | Priority number, date | FR19980002172 | 20.02.1998 Original published format: FR 9802172 | [2000/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9942306 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1056605 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1056605 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/28, B60C9/20 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
B60C9/20 (EP,US);
B60C9/28 (EP,US);
B60C2009/2038 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10765 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10792 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10801 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/49] | Title | German: | REIFEN-VERSTÄRKUNGSGÜRTEL | [2000/49] | English: | TYRE TOP REINFORCEMENT PLY | [2000/49] | French: | ARMATURE DE SOMMET POUR PNEUMATIQUE | [2000/49] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 31.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.05.2004 | SE | 12.08.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/52] | SE | 12.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4934429 (KOSEKI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-5 * abstract *; | [DA]FR2419185 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]); | [A]US4669520 (KOSEKI HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US4498514 (MAATHUIS ANTONNIS G [LU], et al); | [A]EP0416893 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) |