EP1060218 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE STABILITY OF A SLURRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Revocation of patent | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kemira Oyj Porkkalankatu 3 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2005/22] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states KEMIRA CHEMICALS OY P.O. Box 330 00101 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUKKANEN, Pentti Laanila 1 A 2 FIN-90620 Oulu / FI | 02 /
LEHTINEN, Kari Bronrinne 3 as 27 FIN-02400 Kirkkonummi / FI | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Svensson, Johan Henrik, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Svensson, Johan Henrik, et al Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 99906269.8 | 23.02.1999 | [2000/51] | WO1999FI00140 | Priority number, date | FI19980000417 | 24.02.1998 Original published format: FI 980417 | FI19980002735 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: FI 982735 | [2000/51] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9943756 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1060218 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1060218 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/02, C09C1/36, C09C1/42, C09C3/06, C09C3/08, B09B5/00, C02F11/06 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
C09C1/025 (EP);
C01P2006/60 (EP);
Y02W10/37 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER STABILITÄT EINER SUSPENSION | [2002/06] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE STABILITY OF A SLURRY | [2000/51] | French: | PROCEDE POUR AMELIORER LA STABILITE D'UNE SUSPENSION EPAISSE | [2000/51] |
Former [2000/51] | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER STABILITÄT EINER DICKE SUSPENSION | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.1999 | Translation filed | 20.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 09.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE Solvay (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Vande Gucht, Anne Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE Solvay (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Vande Gucht, Anne Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2003/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2003
Solvay (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Vande Gucht, Anne Solvay S.A. 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | 25.11.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.05.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.04.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 03.04.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/31] | Appeal following opposition | 01.06.2006 | Appeal received No. T0829/06 | 15.08.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.04.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 03.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.04.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]SU1451031 ; | [X]DE2206775 ; | [A]WO9801621 ; | [A]WO9744398 (CENTRE NAT ETD SPATIALES [FR], et al); | [A]EP0439374 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 44, Database accession no. 1989-322077, XP002998635 & SU1451031 A 19890115 (GIPRONINEMETALLORUD) |