EP1060024 - CLOSURE PLUG ARRAY WITH BLIND BORES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHROMACOL LIMITED Glen Ross House 3 Little Mundells Mundells Industrial Centre Welwyn Garden City, Herts AL7 1EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states CHROMACOL LIMITED Glen Ross House 3 Little Mundells Mundells Industrial Centre Welwyn Garden City, Herts AL7 1EW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOK, Charles David, 5 The Foxgloves, Boxmoor Hemel Hempstead Hertfordshire HP1 2DD / GB | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99906332.4 | 22.02.1999 | [2000/51] | WO1999GB00535 | Priority number, date | GB19980004383 | 03.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9804383 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944745 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1060024 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1060024 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/14 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
B01L3/50853 (EP,US);
B01L1/00 (EP,US);
B01L3/50825 (EP,US);
B01L3/5085 (EP,US);
Y10S215/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [2002/08] |
Former [2000/51] | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSKAPPEN-ARRAY MIT BLINDBOHRUNGEN | [2000/51] | English: | CLOSURE PLUG ARRAY WITH BLIND BORES | [2000/51] | French: | BOUCHONS DE FERMETURE A ALESAGE AVEUGLE | [2000/51] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 03.09.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 24.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.07.2002 | NL | 24.07.2002 | SE | 24.10.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/05] | NL | 24.07.2002 | |
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/10] | NL | 24.07.2002 | |
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 24.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0285496 (IRE MEDGENIX SA [BE]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 3, line 65 - column 5, line 26 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4960219 (JORDAN WILLIE W [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * column 1, line 6 - column 1, line 15 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 37 * * figures 1-8 *; | [XA]US5720406 (FASSBIND WALTER [CH], et al) [X] 6 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 42 * * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 34 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 41 * * figures 7-12 * [A] 1-4,7; | [A]US5632396 (BURNS JAMES A [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 4 - column 7, line 42 * * figures 9,10 * |