EP1053374 - Flooring system comprising floorboards with guiding means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/47] | GUIDING MEANS AT A JOINT | ||
[2005/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pergo (Europe) AB Strandridaregatan 8 231 25 Trelleborg / SE | [2003/50] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states PERSTORP FLOORING AB Strandridaregatan 8 S-231 25 Trelleborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLOFSSON, Ola Torupsgatan 23 S-231 66 Trelleborg / SE | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99906620.2 | 01.02.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999SE00128 | Priority number, date | SE19980000311 | 04.02.1998 Original published format: SE 9800311 | [2000/47] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940273 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053374 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1053374 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/04 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
E04B1/6125 (EP,US);
E04F15/04 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0107 (EP,US);
E04F2201/021 (EP,US);
E04F2201/041 (EP,US);
F16B2200/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | Fussbodensystem umfassend Fussbodenplatten mit Führungsmitteln | [2005/09] | English: | Flooring system comprising floorboards with guiding means | [2005/09] | French: | Système de plancher comprenant des planches pourvues de moyens de guidage | [2005/09] |
Former [2000/47] | FÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG AN EINER FUGE | ||
Former [2000/47] | GUIDING MEANS AT A JOINT | ||
Former [2000/47] | MOYEN DE GUIDAGE D'UNE JOINTURE | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1999 | Translation filed | 27.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 27.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 27.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.2005 | BE | 10.08.2005 | CH | 10.08.2005 | CY | 10.08.2005 | FI | 10.08.2005 | FR | 10.08.2005 | IT | 10.08.2005 | LI | 10.08.2005 | NL | 10.08.2005 | DK | 10.11.2005 | GR | 10.11.2005 | SE | 10.11.2005 | ES | 21.11.2005 | PT | 10.01.2006 | GB | 01.02.2006 | IE | 01.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/17] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
IT | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
GB | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
GB | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | ||
ES | 21.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
FI | 10.08.2005 | ||
SE | 10.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US752694 ; | [X]US5165816 (PARASIN ALEXANDER V [CA]); | [A]WO9627721 (PERSTORP FLOORING AB [SE], et al); | [Y]WO9747834 (UNILIN BEHEER BV [NL]) | Examination | WO9426999 |