EP1052935 - SYSTEM FOR LOCATING IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 7000 Central Avenue N.E. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIJAND, Koen, J. Moerbeistraat 73 NL-3235 EG Rockanje / NL | 02 /
HALLER, Markus Route de Burtigny 24 CH-1268 Begnins / CH | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99906698.8 | 01.02.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999US02173 | Priority number, date | US19980017198 | 02.02.1998 Original published format: US 17198 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9938438 | Date: | 05.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052935 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1052935 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/06, A61M5/142 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
A61M5/14276 (EP,US);
A61B5/06 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3523 (EP,US);
A61M2209/045 (EP,US);
A61M5/427 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2000/47] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR ORTUNG EINER IMPLANTIERBAREN MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2000/47] | English: | SYSTEM FOR LOCATING IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE | [2000/47] | French: | SYSTEME DE LOCALISATION DE DISPOSITIF MEDICAL IMPLANTABLE | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1100874 (TELEFUNKEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,12,14,16 * column 3, line 3 - line 42 *; | [XA]DE4037586 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column 4, line 9 - line 54; claims 5,6 * [A] 12-15; | [X]US5211165 (DUMOULIN CHARLES L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,12-14 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 62 *; | [XA]US5375596 (TWISS ROBERT G [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11 * column 4, line 3 - line 31 * * column 6, line 47 - line 58 * * column 8, line 16 - column 9, line 25 * * column 10, line 40 - column 11, line 30 * * column 12, line 62 - column 13, line 10 * [A] 16,18,12,13; | [X]US5443066 (DUMOULIN CHARLES L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,12,14,15 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 53 * * column 5, line 25 - line 41 *; | [A]WO9632060 (NAVION BIOMEDICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,6-9,12-14,18 * page 8, line 7 - page 10, line 12 ** page 15, line 19 - line 30 * | by applicant | US5171228 |