EP1054692 - ANTIBODIES AGAINST HUMAN CD40 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY P.O. Box 4000 Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARUFFO, Alejandro, A. 33 Cheston Court Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 02 /
HOLLENBAUGH, Diane 344 Wrights Road Newtown, PA 18940 / US | 03 /
SIADAK, Anthony, W. 6210 First Avenue, N.W. Seattle, WA 98107 / US | 04 /
BERRY, Karen, K. 180 Review Avenue Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 05 /
HARRIS, Linda, J. 1214 16th Avenue, N.E. Seattle, WA 98112-3313 / US | 06 /
THORNE, Barbara, A. 3626 223 Avenue, S.E. Issaquah, WA 98029 / US | 07 /
BAJORATH, Jurgen 17406 37th Avenue Lynnwood, WA 98037 / US | 08 /
WU, Herren 5255 Timber Branch Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 09 /
HUSE, William, D. 1993 Zapo Street Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 10 /
WATKINS, Jeffry, D. 455 Jolina Way Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99906915.6 | 10.02.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999US02949 | Priority number, date | US19980026291 | 19.02.1998 Original published format: US 26291 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9942075 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1054692 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/28, C12N15/13 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (KR);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/48] | Extension states | AL | 18.09.2000 | LT | 18.09.2000 | LV | 18.09.2000 | MK | 18.09.2000 | RO | 18.09.2000 | SI | 18.09.2000 | Title | German: | ANTIKÖROER GEGEN MENSCHLICHES CD40 | [2000/48] | English: | ANTIBODIES AGAINST HUMAN CD40 | [2000/48] | French: | ANTICORPS CONTRE LE CD40 HUMAIN | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9311252 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * figures 3d-3f * * 93% identity with seq.ID 3 *; | [X]WO9632495 (LG CHEMICALS LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,10-12 * claim 2 * * Light chain seq. 93,5% identity with seq.ID1 * * page 4, lines 16-20 * * page 5, lines 15-19 *; | [X]WO9731025 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [X] 1-12 * example 8 * * page 1, lines 5-10 *; | [T]WO0029445 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [T] 1,4-6 *claim16a* *seq.ID 3:> 90%identity with seq.ID 8 and 12 of the application* * figure 5 *; | [X] - HARTOG DEN M ET AL, "GENERATION OF A HUMANIZED ANTI-CD40 MAB FOR TREATMENT OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASES", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, NL, (199611), vol. 2, no. 4, ISSN 1380-2933, page 299, XP002032468 [X] 1-12 * abstract * | [T] - FUNAKOSHI S ET AL, "INHIBITION OF HUMAN B-CELL LYMPHOMA GROWTH BY CD40 STIMULATION", BLOOD, W.B. SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, VA, US, (19940515), vol. 83, no. 10, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2787 - 2794, XP002919673 [T] 13,14 * the whole document * | [T] - LAW CHE-LEUNG ET AL, "Preclinical antitumor activity of a humanized anti-CD40 monoclonal antibody SGN-40.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20031116), Database accession no. PREV200400147706, XP002310999 [T] 13,14 * abstract * | [T] - BLOOD, 45TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; DECEMBER 06-09, 2003, (20031116), vol. 102, no. 11, ISSN 0006-4971, page 646a | International search | [A]US5677165 (DE BOER MARK [NL], et al) |