EP1053000 - AGENTS AND METHODS FOR PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND REPAIR OF CONNECTIVE TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NUTRAMAX LABORATORIES, INC. 2208 Lakeside Boulevard Edgewood, MD 21040 / US | [2000/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDERSON, DVM, Todd, R. 1604 Randallwood Court Jarrettsville, MD 21804 / US | 02 /
CORSON, RN, DVM, Barbara, E. 225 Kunkle Road Fawn Grove, PA 17321 / US | 03 /
HAMMAD, Tarek 715 Crosby Road Baltimore, MD 21236 / US | 04 /
SOLIMAN, Medhat P.O Box 5326 Salmyiah 22064 / KW | 05 /
LIPPIELLO, Louis 1711 Boggs Road Forest Hill, Maryland 21051 / US | [2007/42] |
Former [2001/50] | 01 /
HENDERSON, DVM, Todd, R. 1604 Randallwood Court Jarrettsville, MD 21804 / US | ||
02 /
CORSON, RN, DVM, Barbara, E. 225 Kunkle Road Fawn Grove, PA 17321 / US | |||
03 /
HAMMAD, Tarek 715 Crosby Road Baltimore, MD 21236 / US | |||
04 /
SOLIMAN, Medhat P.O Box 5326 Salmyiah, Kuwait 22064 / US | |||
05 /
LIPPIELLO, Louis 1711 Boggs Road Forest Hill, Maryland 21051 / US | |||
Former [2000/47] | 01 /
HENDERSON, DVM, Todd, R. 1604 Randallwood Court Jarrettsville, MD 21804 / US | ||
02 /
CORSON, RN, DVM, Barbara, E. 225 Kunkle Road Fawn Grove, PA 17321 / US | |||
03 /
HAMMAD, Tarek 715 Crosby Road Baltimore, MD 21236 / US | |||
04 /
SOLIMAN, Medhat 1027 Maiden Choice Lane 6 Baltimore, MD 21229 / US | |||
05 /
LIPPIELLO, Louis 13225 North 83rd Place Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 99906947.9 | 12.02.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999US03019 | Priority number, date | US19980074594P | 13.02.1998 Original published format: US 74594 P | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940926 | Date: | 19.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053000 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1053000 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/65, A61P19/00 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
A61K38/39 (EP);
A61K38/446 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/39, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/446, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2000/47] | A61K35/34, A61K31/65 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHUTZ, ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND ZUR REPARATUR VON BINDEGEWEBE | [2000/47] | English: | AGENTS AND METHODS FOR PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND REPAIR OF CONNECTIVE TISSUE | [2000/47] | French: | AGENTS ET PROCEDES DE PROTECTION, DE TRAITEMENT ET DE REPARATION DE TISSU CONJONCTIF | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08075016.9 / EP1917966 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Request for further processing for: | 01.10.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09143492 ; | [Y]JPS63203628 ; | [XY]GB856493 (PFIZER & CO C) [X] 1,2,4,5 *cf. page 1, left col., lines 14-28* [Y] 11; | [XY]US3328258 (LOUIS FONTAINE) [X] 1,2,4,5 *cf. col. 2, lines 28-36* [Y] 11; | [XPY]EP0852946 (PAOLI AMBROSI GIANFRANCO DE [IT]) [XP] 1,2,4,5 *cf. abstract, page 3, lines 53-57, page 4, lines 25-30, lines 36-43* [Y] 11 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09143492 A 19970603 (KOIKE KATSUMASA) [Y] 3,11 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881221), vol. 012, no. 491, Database accession no. (C - 554), & JP63203628 A 19880823 (TAIYO KAGAKU CO LTD) [Y] 3,11 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4925833 (MCNAMARA THOMAS F [US], et al); | [Y]US5258371 (GOLUB LORNE M [US], et al); | [YP]US5770209 (GROTENDORST GARY R [US], et al) |