EP1064717 - METHOD AND CIRCUIT FOR MEASURING THE ROTATION SPEED OF ELECTRONICALLY SWITCHED FANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Siemens Computers GmbH Domagkstrasse 28 80807 München / DE | [2004/17] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Fujitsu Siemens Computers GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSCH, Peter Flugfeldstrasse 16 D-86179 Augsburg / DE | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/04] | Epping, Hermann, Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/01] | Hermann, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing., et al Epping, Hermann & Fischer Postfach 12 10 26 80034 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99907274.7 | 25.01.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999DE00174 | Priority number, date | DE1998107253 | 20.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19807253 | [2001/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9943078 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064717 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064717 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/06, H02P7/28 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
H02P7/0094 (EP,US);
H02P6/06 (EP,US);
H02P7/2805 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/01] | H02P6/06, H02P5/16 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2001/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR DREHZAHLERFASSUNG VON ELEKTRONISCH KOMMUTIERTEN LÜFTERN | [2001/01] | English: | METHOD AND CIRCUIT FOR MEASURING THE ROTATION SPEED OF ELECTRONICALLY SWITCHED FANS | [2001/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET CIRCUIT POUR MESURER LA VITESSE DE ROTATION DE SOUFFLANTES A COMMUTATION ELECTRONIQUE | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 11.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 26.11.2008 | IT | 26.11.2008 | NL | 26.11.2008 | [2011/28] |
Former [2010/06] | IE | 26.11.2008 | |
NL | 26.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | NL | 26.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE2617131 (PAPST MOTOREN KG) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A] - H. SAX, "Tachoregelung ohne Tachogenerator", ELEKTRONIK, DE, (198408), vol. 33, no. 16, pages 40 - 44, XP002105032 [A] 1,5 * the whole document * |