EP1066441 - MOTOR VEHICLE HINGE WITH A BRAKING AND HOLDING FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ED. Scharwächter GmbH Hohenhagener Strasse 26-28 42855 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states ED. Scharwächter GmbH Hohenhagener Strasse 26-28 42855 Remscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÜCKNER, Lothar Markgrönninger Weg 2 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
MAGNUS, Nils Auguststrasse 30A D-42859 Remscheid / DE | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Sparing, Rolf Klaus Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei European Patent & Trademark Law Firm Goltsteinstrasse 19 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Sparing, Rolf Klaus Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei European Patent & Trademark Law Firm Bankstrasse 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99907298.6 | 28.01.1999 | [2001/02] | WO1999DE00254 | Priority number, date | DE1998113520 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19813520 | [2001/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9949164 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066441 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1066441 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05D11/08, E05D11/00 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
E05D5/121 (EP,US);
E05D11/084 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/531 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | KRAFTWAGENSCHARNIER MIT BREMS- UND HALTEFUNKTION | [2001/02] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE HINGE WITH A BRAKING AND HOLDING FUNCTION | [2001/02] | French: | CHARNIERE POUR AUTOMOBILES POURVUE D'UNE FONCTION DE FREINAGE ET DE RETENUE | [2001/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 04.10.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 12.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 16.05.2001 | IT | 16.05.2001 | NL | 16.05.2001 | PT | 16.08.2001 | SE | 16.08.2001 | [2008/17] |
Former [2003/10] | GB | 16.05.2001 | |
NL | 16.05.2001 | ||
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | GB | 16.05.2001 | |
PT | 16.08.2001 | ||
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/16] | GB | 16.05.2001 | |
SE | 16.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 16.08.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2442326 (SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1* page 6, line 13 - line 19 *; | [Y]FR2670530 (COUTIER MOULAGE GEN IND [FR]) [Y] 1,3 * page 7, line 12 - line 15 * * figure -; claim 5 *; | [Y]DE4406824 (KUEHL HANS [DE]) [Y] 1,3 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 29; figure - * * column 9, line 28 - line 65 *; | [Y]EP0691448 (COUTIER MOULAGE GEN IND [FR]) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 11 - line 13 * * column 5, paragraph 2; figure - * |