EP1051413 - QUINOLINE DERIVATIVES AS ANTIBACTERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham plc 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COATES, William, John GlaxoSmithklineServicesUnLmdt New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 02 /
GWYNN, Michael, Norman Research & Development P.O.Box 5089 1250 South Collegeville Road Collegeville, PA 19426-0989 / US | 03 /
HATTON, Ian, Keith GlaxoSmithKline ServicesUnLtd New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 04 /
MASTERS, Philip, John GlaxoSmithKline Services Unltd New Frontiers Science Park Third Avenue Harlow Essex CM 19 5AW / GB | 05 /
PEARSON, Neil, David GlaxoSmithKline Services UnLtd New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 06 /
RAHMAN, Shahzad, Sharooq GlaxoSmithKlineServicesUnLd New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 07 /
SLOCOMBE, Brian GlaxoSmithKline Services Unldt New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 08 /
WARRACK, Julie, Dorothy GlaxoSmithKlineServicesUnLtd New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | [2003/20] |
Former [2000/46] | 01 /
COATES, William, John Smithkline Beecham Pharma. New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | ||
02 /
GWYNN, Michael, Norman SmithKline Beecham Pharma. 1250 South Collegeville Road Collegeville, PA 19426-0989 / US | |||
03 /
HATTON, Ian, Keith SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceut. New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | |||
04 /
MASTERS, Philip, John SmithKline Beecham Pharmace. SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | |||
05 /
PEARSON, Neil, David SmithKline Beecham Pharmace. New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow Essex CM19 5AW / GB | |||
06 /
RAHMAN, Shahzad, Sharooq SmithKline Beecham Pharma New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | |||
07 /
SLOCOMBE, Brian SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | |||
08 /
WARRACK, Julie, Dorothy SmithKline Beecham Pharma. New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | Representative(s) | Valentine, Jill Barbara, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Valentine, Jill Barbara, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99907388.5 | 21.01.1999 | [2000/46] | WO1999EP00333 | Priority number, date | GB19980001630 | 26.01.1998 Original published format: GB 9801630 | GB19980021072 | 29.09.1998 Original published format: GB 9821072 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937635 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1051413 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1051413 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, A61K31/47, C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D405/14 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP);
C07D405/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/46] | Title | German: | CHINOLINDERIVATE ALS ANTIBAKTERIELLES ARZNEIMITTEL | [2000/46] | English: | QUINOLINE DERIVATIVES AS ANTIBACTERIALS | [2000/46] | French: | DERIVES DE QUINOLINE UTILISES COMME ANTIBACTERIENS | [2000/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 30.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 04.06.2003 | LI | 04.06.2003 | NL | 04.06.2003 | [2004/02] | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1496371 (SERDEX) [A] 15,16 * page 1 *; | [A]US3362875 (STRAUSS ROBERT R, et al) [A] 15,16 * column 1 - column 2 *; | [DA]EP0030044 (ACF CHEMIEFARMA NV [NL]) [DA] 12,14 * claims 1,25 *; | [DA]DE2315148 (OMNIUM CHIMIQUE SA) [DA] 12,14 * claims 1,7 * |