EP1042369 - GEL-FREE PROCESS FOR MAKING FUNCTIONALIZED ANIONICALLY POLYMERIZED POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRATON Polymers Research B.V. Badhuisweg 3 1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [2001/50] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENING, Robert, Charles 21807 Cayman Point Drive Katy, TX 77450 / US | 02 /
GOODWIN, Daniel, Earl 22307 Cimarron Parkway Katy, TX 77450 / US | 03 /
HANDLIN Dale, Lee, Jr. 2816 Windchase Boulevard Houston, TX 77082 / US | 04 /
WILKEY, John, David 3438 Kennonview Drive Houston, TX 77068 / US | 05 /
WILLIS, Carl, Lesley 15922 Red Willow Houston, TX 77084 / US | 06 /
DONAHO, Charles, Roy 1914 Mistyvale Court Richmond, TX 77469 / US | 07 /
DIAZ, Zaida 12106 Meadow Lake Houston, TX 77077 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Kortekaas, Marcel C.J.A., et al KRATON Polymers Research B.V. Intellectual Property Services Postbus 37666 1030 BH Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Kortekaas, Marcellinus C. J. A., et al KRATON Polymers Research B.V., P.O. Box 37666 1030 BH Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2001/22] | Kortekaas, Marcellinus C. J. A., et al KRATON Polymers Research B.V. P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99907478.4 | 03.02.1999 | [2000/41] | WO1999EP00667 | Priority number, date | US19980073592P | 03.02.1998 Original published format: US 73592 P | US19980079876P | 30.03.1998 Original published format: US 79876 P | US19980087920P | 04.06.1998 Original published format: US 87920 P | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940121 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042369 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08C19/42, C08C19/44, C08F8/00, C08F8/42 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
C08C19/44 (EP,KR);
C08C19/42 (EP,KR);
C08F8/00 (EP,KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F12/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/41] | Title | German: | GELFREIE VERFAHREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON ANIONISCH POLYMERISIERTEN POLYMEREN MIT FUNKTIONELLEN GRUPPEN | [2000/41] | English: | GEL-FREE PROCESS FOR MAKING FUNCTIONALIZED ANIONICALLY POLYMERIZED POLYMERS | [2000/41] | French: | PROCEDE EXEMPT DE GEL POUR LA PREPARATION DE POLYMERES FONCTIONNALISES A POLYMERISATION ANIONIQUE | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 22.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5393843 (HANDLIN JR DALE L [US], et al) [DA] * column 5, line 1 - line 12; claim - * |