EP1062479 - POSITION INDICATING DEVICE FOR PORTABLE HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Batrel, Claude André François 400, route de Saint André 69730 Genay / FR | For all designated states Becker, Christian Guy Louis 3, chemin des Ifs 69340 Francheville / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Batrel, Claude André François 400, route de Saint André 69730 Genay / FR | ||
For all designated states Becker, Christian Guy Louis 3, chemin des Ifs 69340 Francheville / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Martin, Didier Roland Valéry, et al Cabinet Didier Martin 50, chemin des Verrières 69260 Charbonnières-les-Bains / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Martin, Didier, et al Cabinet Didier Martin 50, Chemin des Verrières 69260 Charbonnières-les-Bains / FR | ||
Former [2000/52] | Martin, Didier Roland Valéry Cabinet Didier Martin 47, rue Benoit Bennier 69260 Charbonnières-les Bains / FR | Application number, filing date | 99907680.5 | 11.03.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999FR00537 | Priority number, date | FR19980003212 | 11.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9803212 | [2000/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9946560 | Date: | 16.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062479 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062479 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01C9/10, G01C9/06, B25H1/00, A01G3/053, B25F5/02 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
B25H1/0085 (EP);
G01C9/10 (EP);
G01C2009/066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2003/26] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | POSITIONSANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR TRAGBARES HAUSHALTSGERÄT | [2000/52] | English: | POSITION INDICATING DEVICE FOR PORTABLE HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE | [2000/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF INDICATEUR DE POSITION POUR APPAREIL PORTABLE A USAGE DOMESTIQUE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 12.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GR, IE, MC | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 30.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Request for further processing for: | 30.09.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.11.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.11.2000 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2000 | 20.11.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2000 | 20.11.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2000 | 20.11.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2000 | 20.11.2000 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2000 | 20.11.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2000 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2000 | 20.11.2000 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2000 | 20.11.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   11.12.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.06.2003 | CY | 25.06.2003 | FI | 25.06.2003 | GB | 25.06.2003 | IT | 25.06.2003 | NL | 25.06.2003 | DK | 25.09.2003 | PT | 25.09.2003 | SE | 25.09.2003 | DE | 26.09.2003 | ES | 22.12.2003 | LU | 11.03.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
CY | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GB | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
DE | 26.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
LU | 11.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GB | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
DE | 26.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
LU | 11.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GB | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
DE | 26.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GB | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
DE | 26.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GB | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 25.06.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR520551 (WILLIAM EDWARDS GRANT [GB]) [Y] 1,5,6,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR982948 (JAEGER AVIAT) [A] 1* page 2, column L, line 54 - column R, line 12; figure 1 *; | [A]US4073062 (WRIGHT DONALD E) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US5467532 (AMES SHERRY A [US]) [Y] 1,5,6,9,10 * abstract * |