EP1051745 - A METHOD FOR GENERATING ELECTRICAL CONDUCTING OR SEMICONDUCTING STRUCTURES IN TWO OR THREE DIMENSIONS, A METHOD FOR ERASING THE SAME STRUCTURES AND AN ELECTRIC FIELD GENERATOR/MODULATOR FOR USE WITH THE METHOD FOR GENERATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thin Film Electronics ASA P.O. Box 1872 Vika 0124 Oslo / NO | [2000/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORDAL, Per-Erik B stadryggen 19 N-1370 Asker / NO | 02 /
LEISTAD, Geirr, I. Jongsstubben 19 N-1300 Sandvika / NO | 03 /
GUDESEN, Hans, Gude Tyrihansveien 5 N-1639 Gamle Fredrikstad / NO | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Bokinge, Ole, et al Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Bokinge, Ole, et al Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | ||
Former [2000/46] | Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99907966.8 | 28.01.1999 | [2000/46] | WO1999NO00022 | Priority number, date | NO19980000385 | 28.01.1998 Original published format: NO 980385 | NO19980002518 | 02.06.1998 Original published format: NO 982518 | [2000/46] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944229 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1051745 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1051745 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/64 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
H01L21/768 (EP,US);
H01L21/26 (KR);
H10K71/00 (US);
H01L21/8221 (EP,US);
H10K71/50 (EP,US);
H01L21/76888 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG ZWEI- ODER DREIDIMENSIONALER ELEKTRISCH LEITENDER ODER HALBLEITENDER STRUKTUREN, EINE LÖSCHMETHODE DERSELBEN UND EIN GENERATOR/MODULATOR EINES ELEKTRISCHEN FELDES ZUM GEBRAUCH IN DER HERSTELLUNGSMETHODE | [2006/42] | English: | A METHOD FOR GENERATING ELECTRICAL CONDUCTING OR SEMICONDUCTING STRUCTURES IN TWO OR THREE DIMENSIONS, A METHOD FOR ERASING THE SAME STRUCTURES AND AN ELECTRIC FIELD GENERATOR/MODULATOR FOR USE WITH THE METHOD FOR GENERATING | [2000/46] | French: | GENERATION DE STRUCTURES BI- OU TRIDIMENSIONNELLES ELECTROCONDUCTRICES OU SEMI-CONDUCTRICES, EFFACEMENT DE CES STRUCTURES, ET GENERATEUR / MODULATEUR DE CHAMP ELECTRIQUE POUR UNE TELLE GENERATION | [2000/46] |
Former [2000/46] | METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG ZWEI- ODER DREIDIMENSIONALER ELEKTRISCH LEITENDER ODER HALBLEITENDER STRUKTUREN, EINE LÖSCHMETHODE DERSELBEN UND EIN GENERATOR/MODULATOR EINES ELEKTRISCHEN FELDES ZUM GEBRAUCH IN DER HESRTELLUNGSMETHODE | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1999 | Translation filed | 25.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 25.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2007 | BE | 07.11.2007 | CH | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | LI | 07.11.2007 | NL | 07.11.2007 | IE | 28.01.2008 | IT | 31.01.2008 | SE | 07.02.2008 | ES | 18.02.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | [2011/28] |
Former [2009/15] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 28.01.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 28.01.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9509438 (KOPIN CORP [US]); | [X]US5537108 (NATHAN RICHARD J [US], et al); | [X]US5572409 (NATHAN RICHARD J [US], et al); | [A]US5686341 (ROESNER BRUCE BOYD [US]); | [XP]US5808351 (NATHAN RICHARD J [US], et al) | Examination | US5677041 |