EP1060060 - ROLLER TABLE DEVICE FOR CARPENTER'S AND JOINER'S POWER SAW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ernex AS P.O. Box 10 1790 Tistedal / NO | [2000/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Jan Sundslitoppen N-1796 Kornsj / NO | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99907973.4 | 04.03.1999 | [2000/51] | WO1999NO00074 | Priority number, date | NO19980001011 | 06.03.1998 Original published format: NO 981011 | [2000/51] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944794 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1060060 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1060060 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B27B5/16 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
B23D47/025 (EP);
B23D45/068 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | ROLLENGEFÜHRTER TISCH FÜR UNTERKREISSÄGE | [2000/51] | English: | ROLLER TABLE DEVICE FOR CARPENTER'S AND JOINER'S POWER SAW | [2000/51] | French: | TABLE A ROULEAUX POUR SCIE DE MENUISIER | [2000/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.1999 | Translation filed | 20.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 31.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.09.2002 | BE | 18.09.2002 | CH | 18.09.2002 | FI | 18.09.2002 | FR | 18.09.2002 | GR | 18.09.2002 | IT | 18.09.2002 | LI | 18.09.2002 | NL | 18.09.2002 | DK | 18.12.2002 | PT | 19.12.2002 | CY | 04.03.2003 | IE | 04.03.2003 | LU | 04.03.2003 | ES | 28.03.2003 | MC | 31.03.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 18.09.2002 | |
BE | 18.09.2002 | ||
CH | 18.09.2002 | ||
FI | 18.09.2002 | ||
FR | 18.09.2002 | ||
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
LI | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
DK | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
CY | 04.03.2003 | ||
IE | 04.03.2003 | ||
LU | 04.03.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 18.09.2002 | |
BE | 18.09.2002 | ||
CH | 18.09.2002 | ||
FI | 18.09.2002 | ||
FR | 18.09.2002 | ||
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
LI | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
CY | 04.03.2003 | ||
IE | 04.03.2003 | ||
LU | 04.03.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 18.09.2002 | |
BE | 18.09.2002 | ||
CH | 18.09.2002 | ||
FI | 18.09.2002 | ||
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
LI | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
CY | 04.03.2003 | ||
IE | 04.03.2003 | ||
LU | 04.03.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 18.09.2002 | |
BE | 18.09.2002 | ||
CH | 18.09.2002 | ||
FI | 18.09.2002 | ||
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
LI | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
CY | 04.03.2003 | ||
IE | 04.03.2003 | ||
LU | 04.03.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 18.09.2002 | |
BE | 18.09.2002 | ||
CH | 18.09.2002 | ||
FI | 18.09.2002 | ||
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
LI | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
IE | 04.03.2003 | ||
LU | 04.03.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 18.09.2002 | |
BE | 18.09.2002 | ||
CH | 18.09.2002 | ||
FI | 18.09.2002 | ||
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
LI | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
IE | 04.03.2003 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 18.09.2002 | |
BE | 18.09.2002 | ||
CH | 18.09.2002 | ||
FI | 18.09.2002 | ||
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
LI | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 18.09.2002 | |
BE | 18.09.2002 | ||
CH | 18.09.2002 | ||
FI | 18.09.2002 | ||
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
LI | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 18.09.2002 | |
CH | 18.09.2002 | ||
FI | 18.09.2002 | ||
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
LI | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 18.09.2002 | |
FI | 18.09.2002 | ||
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | FI | 18.09.2002 | |
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
PT | 19.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | FI | 18.09.2002 | |
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
NL | 18.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 18.09.2002 | |
GR | 18.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 18.09.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0117505 (SCHEPPACH MASCHF J [DE]); | [A]DE3506783 (OTT WERKZEUG & MASCHF G [DE]); | [A]WO9701421 (ERNEX A S [NO], et al) |