EP1053139 - ANTITHEFT INTERRUPT SYSTEM FOR VEHICLE STARTER OR SOLENOID CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Labken Limited Partners Inc. Suite 250, 570 Rancheros Drive San Marcos, CA 92069 / US | [2000/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LABELLE, James, L. 39672 Corte Santa Barbara Murrieta, CA 92563 / US | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Shortt, Peter Bernard, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Shortt, Peter Bernard, et al TOMKINS & CO., 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 99908087.2 | 01.02.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999US02102 | Priority number, date | US19980020585 | 02.02.1998 Original published format: US 20585 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9938735 | Date: | 05.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053139 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/04 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
B60R25/045 (EP,US);
B60R25/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | DIEBSTAHLSICHERES UNTERBRECHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DEN ANLASSER ODER DIE SOLENOIDSCHALTUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [2000/47] | English: | ANTITHEFT INTERRUPT SYSTEM FOR VEHICLE STARTER OR SOLENOID CIRCUIT | [2000/47] | French: | SYSTEME D'INTERRUPTION ANTIVOL POUR DEMARREUR DE VEHICULE OU CIRCUIT DU SOLENOIDE | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 15.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/14] | 07.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4209709 (BETTON ARNOLD L [US]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 4 * * column 5, line 47 - line 65 *; | [Y]DE4338637 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 16 - line 34; figure . * | International search | [X]US5564376 (LABELLE JAMES L [US], et al); | [X]US4209709 (BETTON ARNOLD L [US]); | [Y]US5453730 (DE-GRINIS REINHARD H [US], et al); | [Y]US4533016 (BETTON ARNOLD L [US]); | [Y]US4842093 (LERCHE NOLAN C [US], et al) | by applicant | US4733638 |