EP0992172 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING A HANDOFF IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, SUCH AS A HARD HANDOFF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2005/32] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODENWALDER, Joseph, P. 14967 Rancho Real Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/29] | Knospe, Michael Howrey LLP Rechtsanwälte Campo Sentilo Gmunder Strasse 53 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Knospe, Michael Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Prannerstraße 10 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/07] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2006/39] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | Bardehle, Heinz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/15] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99908139.1 | 12.02.1999 | [2000/15] | WO1999US03088 | Priority number, date | US19980074733P | 13.02.1998 Original published format: US 74733 P | US19990248700 | 11.02.1999 Original published format: US 248700 | US19990248701 | 11.02.1999 Original published format: US 248701 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9941934 | Date: | 19.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0992172 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0992172 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
H04W36/0094 (EP);
H04W52/12 (EP);
H04W52/50 (EP);
H04W52/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DURCHFÜHREN DES WEITERREICHENS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, WIE BEISPIELSWEISE HARTES WEITERREICHEN | [2000/15] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING A HANDOFF IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, SUCH AS A HARD HANDOFF | [2000/15] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR LE TRANSFERT DANS UN SYSTEME DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION, DU TYPE TRANSFERT STRICT | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 07.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05007867.4 / EP1558050 | EP07015116.2 / EP1848239 | EP07016648.3 / EP1855501 | EP09006886.7 / EP2091284 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI Opponent's representative Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI Opponent's representative Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | 13.07.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.01.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.05.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 22.09.2008 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/48] | Appeal following opposition | 07.07.2008 | Appeal received No. T1311/08 | 22.09.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.2005 | BE | 10.08.2005 | CH | 10.08.2005 | CY | 10.08.2005 | LI | 10.08.2005 | NL | 10.08.2005 | DK | 10.11.2005 | GR | 10.11.2005 | PT | 10.01.2006 | IE | 13.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
IE | 13.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
DK | 10.11.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
BE | 10.08.2005 | ||
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
PT | 10.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 10.08.2005 | |
CH | 10.08.2005 | ||
LI | 10.08.2005 | ||
NL | 10.08.2005 | ||
GR | 10.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 10.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0667726 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 3-6 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 35 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9729611 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [A] 1,2,7,20,25,26 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 17 * * page 8, line 24 - page 10, line 3 * * page 22, line 6 - line 17 * * page 28, line 1 - line 12 * * page 29, line 3 - line 16 * * figures 1,2,7,12,14A *; | [A] - SATARASINGHE P, "A NOVEL METHOD FOR CDMA HARD HANDOFF", COMMUNICATIONS: THE KEY TO GLOBAL PROSPERITY. GLOBECOM 1996, LONDON, NOV. 18 - 22, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19961118), vol. 3, pages 1766 - 1768, XP000748752 [A] 15 * page 1767, left-hand column, line 29 - right-hand column, line 27 * |