EP1062530 - STEREOSCOPIC, LONG-DISTANCE MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Questar Corporation 6204 Ingham Road New Hope, PA 18938 / US | For all designated states Duke University Erwin Road Durham North Carolina 27706 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Questar Corporation 6204 Ingham Road New Hope, PA 18938 / US | ||
For all designated states DUKE UNIVERSITY Erwin Road Durham, North Carolina 27706 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNIGHT, Douglas, M., Sr. 68 Upper Creek Road Stockton, NJ 08559 / US | 02 /
MACHEMER, Robert 1532 Pinecrest Road Durham, NC 27705 / US | 03 /
OVERAKER, Ronald, F. 2618 Pleasant Green Road Durham, NC 27705 / US | 04 /
DODGE, Brian, C. 529 Lakeshore Drive Hillsborough, NC 27278 / US | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Lenzing, Andreas Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Postfach 20 05 09 40103 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Lenzing, Andreas, Dr. Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Münsterstrasse 248 40470 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99908185.4 | 19.02.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999US03303 | Priority number, date | US19980078146P | 16.03.1998 Original published format: US 78146 P | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947949 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062530 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/08, G02B5/10, G02B13/14, G02B17/00, G02B21/00, G02B21/22, G02B23/00, G01J1/42, G01J3/44, G01J5/02, G01N21/55, G02B17/08, G02B21/04 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
G02B17/0884 (EP,US);
G02B17/08 (EP,US);
G02B17/0808 (EP,US);
G02B21/04 (EP,US);
G02B21/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/52] | G02B5/08, G02B5/10, G02B13/14, G02B17/00, G02B21/00, G02B21/22, G02B23/00, G01J1/42, G01J3/44, G01J5/02, G01N21/55 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [2000/52] | Title | German: | STEREOSKOPISCHES WEITABSTAND-MIKROSKOP | [2000/52] | English: | STEREOSCOPIC, LONG-DISTANCE MICROSCOPE | [2000/52] | French: | MICROSCOPE STEREOSCOPIQUE LONGUE DISTANCE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.2001 | 28.02.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2628529 (BRAYMER LAWRENCE E); | [X]US2670656 (BRAYMER LAWRENCE E); | [A]DE1447207 (JENAOPTIK JENA GMBH) | International search | [Y]US2520635 (GREY DAVID S); | [Y]US4059336 (HOPKINS HAROLD HORACE); | [Y]US5011243 (DOYLE WALTER M [US], et al) |