EP1068248 - PERFLUOROELASTOMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyneon LLC 6744 Upper 33rd Street North Oakdale, Minnesota 55128 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states DYNEON LLC 6744 Upper 33rd Street North Oakdale, Minnesota 55128 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROOTAERT, Werner, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/03] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99908238.1 | 18.02.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999US03490 | Priority number, date | US19980079061P | 23.03.1998 Original published format: US 79061 P | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9948939 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068248 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08F214/26 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
C08F214/262 (EP,KR);
C08K5/14 (EP,KR);
C08L27/12 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/14, C08L27/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/03] | Title | German: | PERFLUOROELASTOMERVERBINDUNGEN | [2001/03] | English: | PERFLUOROELASTOMER COMPOSITIONS | [2001/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PERFLUOROELASTOMERES | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 30.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 03.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9702300 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8 * page 5, line 11 - line 29; examples 6-21; claims 1-7 *; | [X]FR2305462 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-4 * examples 1,2 *; | [AD]US5285002 (GROOTAERT WERNER M [US]) [AD] 1-10 * example - * |