EP0992132 - Method and system for transmit gating in a wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/15] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMIT GATING IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
[2007/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2007/41] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTLER, Brian, K. 8736 Glenwick Lane La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/15] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99908249.8 | 19.02.1999 | [2000/15] | WO1999US03533 | Priority number, date | US19980075211P | 19.02.1998 Original published format: US 75211 P | US19990251981 | 17.02.1999 Original published format: US 251981 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9943105 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0992132 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0992132 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04Q7/38 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
H04W52/267 (EP);
H04L1/0002 (EP);
H04L1/0025 (EP);
H04L1/0071 (EP);
H04L1/0072 (EP);
H04W52/40 (EP);
H04W52/60 (EP);
H04W76/28 (EP);
H04L1/0065 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | Übertragungstaktverfahren und -System in einem schnurlosen Kommunikationssystem | [2007/07] | English: | Method and system for transmit gating in a wireless communication system | [2007/07] | French: | Procédé et système de déclencement periodique de transmission dans un réseau de communication sans fil | [2007/07] |
Former [2000/15] | ÜBERTRAGUNGSTAKTVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM IN EINEM SCHNURLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2000/15] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMIT GATING IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2000/15] | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE DECLENCHEMENT PERIODIQUE DE TRANSMISSION DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 24.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.01.2007 | 19.12.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.12.1999 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 | 27.12.1999 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   26.01.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.10.2007 | BE | 10.10.2007 | CH | 10.10.2007 | CY | 10.10.2007 | DK | 10.10.2007 | FI | 10.10.2007 | LI | 10.10.2007 | NL | 10.10.2007 | SE | 10.01.2008 | GR | 11.01.2008 | ES | 21.01.2008 | IE | 19.02.2008 | LU | 19.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | IT | 29.02.2008 | PT | 10.03.2008 | [2011/28] |
Former [2010/28] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IE | 19.02.2008 | ||
LU | 19.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
FI | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IE | 19.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
CY | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IE | 19.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
GR | 11.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IE | 19.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
IE | 19.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
BE | 10.10.2007 | ||
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
DK | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 10.10.2007 | |
CH | 10.10.2007 | ||
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 10.10.2007 | |
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | ||
PT | 10.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 10.10.2007 | |
LI | 10.10.2007 | ||
NL | 10.10.2007 | ||
SE | 10.01.2008 | ||
ES | 21.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9429981 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,10,19,22,27,29,38 * page 7, line 21 - page 12, line 27; figure - *; | [A]US5491718 (GOULD ADAM F [US], et al) [A] 1,10,19,22,27,29,38 * column 4, line 29 - column 7, line 54; figure - *; | [A]FR2736228 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-3,10-13,29* page 5, line 7 - page 12, line 34; figure - *; | [XA]WO9740592 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 25-29,38 * page 6, line 27 - page 15, line 32; figure - * [A] 1-4,10-14,19; | [XA]WO9740593 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 25-29,38 * page 7, line 23 - page 20, line 31; figure - * [A] 1-4,10-14,19; | [A]WO9749201 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-4,10-14,19,22,27,29,38 * page 11, line 13 - page 18, line 15; figure - * | Examination | WO9741653 | - FUYUN LING, "Pilot assisted coherent DS-CDMA reverse-link communications with optimal robust channel estimation", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1997. ICASSP-97., 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MUNICH, GERMANY 21-24 APRIL 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970421), pages 263 - 266, XP010226185 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1997.599619 |