EP1023812 - VIRTUAL CREDIT CARD ACCESS DEVICE FOR MOBILE COMMUNICATION EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bailey, Kenneth S. Suite 900, 17011 Beach Boulevard Huntington Beach, CA 92647 / US | [2000/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99908312.4 | 24.02.1999 | [2000/31] | WO1999US03713 | Priority number, date | US19980041360 | 02.03.1998 Original published format: US 41360 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9945720 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023812 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/00, G07F7/02, G07F7/00, G07C9/00 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
G07F17/0014 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/321 (EP,US);
G06Q20/327 (EP,US);
G06Q20/342 (EP,US);
G06Q20/352 (EP);
G06Q20/4014 (EP,US);
G07C9/257 (EP,US);
G07F7/025 (EP,US);
G07F9/009 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/31] | H04Q7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/31] | Title | German: | ZUGANGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VIRTUELLEN KREDITKARTEN FÜR MOBILE KOMMUNIKATIONSAUSRÜSTUNGEN | [2000/31] | English: | VIRTUAL CREDIT CARD ACCESS DEVICE FOR MOBILE COMMUNICATION EQUIPMENT | [2000/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACCES VIRTUEL DE CARTE DE CREDIT POUR EQUIPEMENT DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 01.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/10] | 05.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.01.2000 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | 23.01.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   24.01.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.04.2001 | 28.02.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2002 | 28.02.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.03.2003 | 29.02.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4718080 (SERRANO ARTHUR L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 60 - column 8, line 48; figures 1-4B *; | [A]US4831647 (D AVELLO ROBERT F [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 25 - line 44 * * column 3, line 25 - column 12, line 61; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US5144649 (ZICKER ROBERT G [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 55 ** column 4, line 62 - column 16, line 33; figures 1-12 *; | [X]US5673306 (AMADON CHARLES GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 50 * * column 4, line 66 - column 16, line 11; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5706330 (BUFFERD CARY [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 34 - column 11, line 6; figures 1-4 *; | [XP]US5850599 (SEIDERMAN ABE [US]) [XP] 1 * column 1, line 63 - column 4, line 63 * * column 5, line 38 - column 28, line 51 * * column 30, line 55 - column 32, line 59; figures 1-11 * | International search | [A]US5583933 (MARK ANDREW R [US]) |