EP1057206 - LOW PRESSURE INDUCTIVELY COUPLED HIGH DENSITY PLASMA REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, ID 83716-9632 / US | [2011/19] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, Idaho 83716-9632 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLALOCK, Guy, T. 8101 Silkwood Court Boise, ID 83704 / US | 02 /
DONOHOE, Kevin, G. 719 W. Ridgeline Drive Boise, ID 83707 / US | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2000/49] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99908542.6 | 26.02.1999 | [2000/49] | WO1999US04325 | Priority number, date | US19980031400 | 26.02.1998 Original published format: US 31400 | [2000/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944219 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1057206 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1057206 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, H05H1/46 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
H01J37/32091 (EP,US);
H01J37/32 (KR);
H01J37/321 (EP,US);
H01J37/32183 (EP,US);
H05H1/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/49] | Title | German: | INDUKTIV GEKOPPELTER NIEDERDRUCK-PLASMAREAKTOR FÜR PLASMEN HOHER DICHTE | [2009/47] | English: | LOW PRESSURE INDUCTIVELY COUPLED HIGH DENSITY PLASMA REACTOR | [2000/49] | French: | REACTEUR A PLASMA HAUTE DENSITE BASSE PRESSION COUPLE PAR INDUCTION | [2000/49] |
Former [2000/49] | NIEDERDRUCK INDUKTIV-GEKOPPELTER HOHE-DICHTIGKEIT PLASMAREAKTOR | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Request for further processing for: | 01.07.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 01.07.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2011 | BE | 11.05.2011 | CY | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | IT | 11.05.2011 | NL | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | ES | 22.08.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | [2012/23] |
Former [2012/10] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 12.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0607797 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,34,35 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 14 * * column 7, line 24 - line 29 * * figure 1 * [A] 11,12,14,16,17 [Y] 5,7,18,23,24; | [YA]US5540800 (QIAN XUEYU [US]) [Y] 5,7,23 * column 1, line 8 - line 12 * * column 3, line 3 - line 23 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 13; | [YA]US5685941 (FORSTER JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 18,23,24 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 55 * * figure 3 * [A] 26,31,32; | [A]EP0810816 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 4,8,10,16,18,26 * column 1, line 3 - line 7 * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 6 * * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 28 * * figure 2 *; | [PA]EP0845800 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [PA] 4,10 * column 4, line 15 - line 28 * * column 8, line 36 - column 9, line 17 ** figures 1-4 * |