EP1062796 - ELECTRONIC CALL ASSISTANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Stationsplein 7 9726 AE Groningen / NL | [2000/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN AMERONGEN, Vincent, Reinier Herensteeg 4 NL-2311 SJ Leiden / NL | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria, et al Koninklijke KPN N.V. Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 25110 3001 HC Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria, et al Koninklijke KPN N.V., Intellectual Property Group, P.O. BOX 95321 2509 CH The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2000/52] | Klein, Bart Koninklijke KPN N.V., P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 99908913.9 | 18.02.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999EP01012 | Priority number, date | EP19980200742 | 09.03.1998 Original published format: EP 98200742 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9946918 | Date: | 16.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062796 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062796 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/50 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
H04M3/527 (EP,US);
H04M2201/16 (EP,US);
H04M2201/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHER ANRUFASSISTENT | [2000/52] | English: | ELECTRONIC CALL ASSISTANT | [2000/52] | French: | ASSISTANT D'APPEL ELECTRONIQUE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | GR | 06.01.2005 | CY | 18.02.2005 | IE | 18.02.2005 | PT | 06.03.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
CY | 18.02.2005 | ||
IE | 18.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
IE | 18.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | GR | 06.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DAX]WO9611542 (WILDFIRE COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [DA] 1,11,22 * page 67, line 24 - line 27 * * page 79, line 18 - line 26 * * page 91, line 18 - line 31 * * page 98 * [X] 26-31; | [PX]WO9837678 (WILDFIRE COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [PX] 26-31 * page 18, line 24 - page 19, line 2 *; | [A] - PARKER T, "HIRING A VIRTUAL PHONE ASSISTANT", BUSINESS MARKETING, US, (199710), vol. 82, no. 9, pages 6 - 8, XP000198979 [A] 1,11,22 |