EP1093482 - POLYURETHANE AND PREPARATION CONTAINING POLYURETHANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Revocation of patent | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLAUCK, Wolfgang Dresdener Strasse 12 D-40670 Meerbusch / DE | 02 /
DUHM, Lydia Haus-Endt-Strasse 78 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
MAJOLO, Martin St. Martinus-Strasse 33 D-41812 Erkelenz / DE | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Steffan & Kiehne Patentanwälte PartG mbB Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Leifert, Elmar Leifert & Steffan Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99908966.7 | 17.03.1999 | [2001/17] | WO1999EP01728 | Priority number, date | DE19981013202 | 25.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19813202 | [2001/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9948942 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1093482 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1093482 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/48, C09D175/08, C09J175/08, C08G18/30 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
C08G18/4866 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08G2190/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/289 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Title | German: | POLYURETHAN UND POLYURETHANHALTIGE ZUBEREITUNG | [2001/17] | English: | POLYURETHANE AND PREPARATION CONTAINING POLYURETHANE | [2001/17] | French: | POLYURETHANE ET PREPARATION CONTENANT DU POLYURETHANE | [2001/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US Opponent's representative Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
17.05.2005
15.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkussen / DE Opponent's representative Roos, Peter, et al, et al Gille Hrabal Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 03
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | 04
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | 05
18.05.2005
06.11.2007
WITHDRAWN hanse chemie AG Charlottenburgerstr. 9 21502 Geesthacht / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US Opponent's representative Gille Hrabal Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
17.05.2005
15.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkussen / DE Opponent's representative Roos, Peter, et al, et al Gille Hrabal Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | |||
04
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SIKA Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | |||
05
18.05.2005
06.11.2007
WITHDRAWN hanse chemie AG Charlottenburgerstr. 9 21502 Geesthacht / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2016/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US Opponent's representative Gille Hrabal Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
17.05.2005
15.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkussen / DE Opponent's representative Levpat c/o Covestro AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | |||
03
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | |||
04
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SIKA Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | |||
05
18.05.2005
06.11.2007
WITHDRAWN hanse chemie AG Charlottenburgerstr. 9 21502 Geesthacht / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2015/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US Opponent's representative Gille Hrabal Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
17.05.2005
15.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkussen / DE Opponent's representative Levpat Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | |||
03
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | |||
04
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SIKA Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | |||
05
18.05.2005
06.11.2007
WITHDRAWN hanse chemie AG Charlottenburgerstr. 9 21502 Geesthacht / DE Opponent's representative Merkau, Bernhard Glawe Delfs Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Liebherrstrasse 20 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US Opponent's representative Gille Hrabal Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
17.05.2005
15.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Patents and Licensing D-51368 Leverkusen / DE Opponent's representative Levpat Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | |||
03
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | |||
04
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SIKA Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | |||
05
18.05.2005
06.11.2007
WITHDRAWN hanse chemie AG Charlottenburgerstr. 9 21502 Geesthacht / DE Opponent's representative Merkau, Bernhard Glawe Delfs Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Liebherrstrasse 20 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2014/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US Opponent's representative Gille Hrabal Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
17.05.2005
15.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Patents and Licensing D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | |||
03
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | |||
04
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SIKA Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | |||
05
18.05.2005
06.11.2007
WITHDRAWN hanse chemie AG Charlottenburgerstr. 9 21502 Geesthacht / DE Opponent's representative Merkau, Bernhard Glawe Delfs Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Liebherrstrasse 20 80538 München / DE | |||
Former [2012/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US Opponent's representative Roos, Peter Gille Hrabal Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
17.05.2005
15.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Patents and Licensing D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | |||
03
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | |||
04
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SIKA Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | |||
05
18.05.2005
06.11.2007
WITHDRAWN hanse chemie AG Charlottenburgerstr. 9 21502 Geesthacht / DE Opponent's representative Merkau, Bernhard Glawe, Delfs, Moll Liebherrstrasse 20 Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US Opponent's representative Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
02
17.05.2005
15.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Patents and Licensing D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | |||
03
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | |||
04
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SIKA Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | |||
05
18.05.2005
06.11.2007
WITHDRAWN hanse chemie AG Charlottenburgerstr. 9 21502 Geesthacht / DE Opponent's representative Merkau, Bernhard c/o Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Liebherrstrasse 20 Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | |||
Former [2007/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US Opponent's representative Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
02
17.05.2005
15.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Patents and Licensing D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | |||
03
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | |||
04
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SIKA Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | |||
05
18.05.2005
06.11.2007
WITHDRAWN hanse chemie AG Charlottenburgerstr. 9 21502 Geesthacht / DE Opponent's representative Merkau, Bernhard c/o Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Liebherrstrasse 20 Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | |||
Former [2006/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US Opponent's representative Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
02
17.05.2005
15.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Patents and Licensing D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | |||
03
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | |||
04
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SIKA Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | |||
05
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE hanse chemie AG Charlottenburgerstr. 9 21502 Geesthacht / DE Opponent's representative Merkau, Bernhard c/o Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Liebherrstrasse 20 Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | |||
Former [2006/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US Opponent's representative Szary, Anne C. London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
02
17.05.2005
15.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Patents and Licensing D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | |||
03
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | |||
04
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SIKA Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | |||
05
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE hanse chemie AG Charlottenburgerstr. 9 21502 Geesthacht / DE Opponent's representative Merkau, Bernhard c/o Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Liebherrstrasse 20 Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | |||
Former [2005/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US Opponent's representative Szary, Anne C. London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
02
17.05.2005
15.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Patents and Licensing D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | |||
03
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE WACKER-CHEMIE GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | |||
04
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | |||
05
18.05.2005
31.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE hanse chemie AG Charlottenburgerstr. 9 21502 Geesthacht / DE Opponent's representative Merkau, Bernhard c/o Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Liebherrstrasse 20 Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | 22.06.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.02.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.03.2006 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M08) | 03.11.2006 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 17.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 05.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.08.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/45] | Appeal following opposition | 27.09.2018 | Appeal received No. T2482/18 | 06.12.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.08.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: closure of the opposition procedure | 02.09.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 26.09.2018 | Appeal received No. T2482/18 | 06.12.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.08.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: closure of the opposition procedure | 02.09.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 25.03.2013 | Appeal received No. T0755/13 | 07.06.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.02.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 14.05.2021 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2021/20] | 14.03.2017 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 14.02.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.02.2017 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.03.2005 | LU | 17.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | IE | 17.03.2016 | GR | 06.10.2016 | GB | 16.03.2019 | PT | 26.03.2019 | [2019/26] |
Former [2019/21] | CY | 17.03.2005 | |
LU | 17.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
IE | 17.03.2016 | ||
GR | 06.10.2016 | ||
GB | 16.03.2019 | ||
Former [2017/13] | CY | 17.03.2005 | |
LU | 17.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
IE | 17.03.2016 | ||
GR | 06.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CY | 17.03.2005 | |
LU | 17.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
IE | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2007/26] | CY | 17.03.2005 | |
LU | 17.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CY | 17.03.2005 | |
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | MC | 31.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0372561 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,12,13 * page 2, line 42 - page 4, line 2 * * page 6, line 48 - page 7, line 56 * * page 8, lines 15-27; example 8; claims 1,9,10 * * page 7, lines 57-58 *; | [X]EP0425694 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,8,12,13* page 4, lines 41-42; example 5; claim - *; | [X]WO9638453 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-4,8,10,12,13 * examples 20,39 *; | [X]EP0748828 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) [X] 1-3,12,13 * examples 2-5; claim -; tables 2-5 * |