EP0981787 - EXCHANGE RATE TABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Canecaude, Emmanuel 22, Rue Brey 75017 Paris / FR | [2000/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Zazzo, Jacques 95, rue Jouffroy d'Abbans 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Zazzo, Jacques, Cabinet Jaques Zazzo 95, rue Jouffroy d'Abbans 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/27] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/09] | Pontet, Bernard, et al Pontet Allano & Associés S.E.L.A.R.L. 25, rue Jean-Rostand Parc Club Orsay Université 91893 Orsay Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99908999.8 | 10.03.1999 | [2000/09] | WO1999FR00528 | Priority number, date | FR19980002916 | 10.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9802916 | FR19980008876 | 10.07.1998 Original published format: FR 9808876 | [2000/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9946656 | Date: | 16.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981787 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06C1/00, G06G1/00, G09F19/14 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
G06G1/0073 (EP);
G06C1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | WECHSELTABELLE | [2000/09] | English: | EXCHANGE RATE TABLE | [2000/09] | French: | TABLE DE CHANGE | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 17.12.1999 | Observations by third parties | 23.04.2003 | Observations by third parties | 07.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2004 | Observations by third parties | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 05.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/14] | Request for further processing for: | 02.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2001 | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2003 | 31.03.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0037270 (MARYLEBONE INVESTMENT CORP) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [A]FR2397695 (ROSENTHAL BRUCE) [A] 1,3,6,7 * page 2, line 3 - line 8 *; | [A]FR2456625 (JOLY PATRICE) [A] 2,3,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5598650 (BROWN BRIGITTE L) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2017371 (BJOERKLAND M E) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]GB822076 (LOGAN) [A] 1 * page 1, line 19 - line 49; figure 1 *; | [A]US3760165 (MARCKS F) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2197198 (PLANCADE CHRISTIAN) [A] 2 * claim 2 * | other | - "EXEMPLES DE CONVERTISSEURS", COLLECTIONNEURS, XX, XX, XX, (19710101), page COMPLETE, XP002932335 | - "Catalog: THE XOGRAPH line by OPTIGRAPHICS, 1976,", ANNOUNCEMENT OPTIGRAPHICS, XX, XX, XX, (19760201), pages 3 - 15, XP002968677 |