EP1064253 - ANTI-TUMOUR AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYLE, Francis Thomas Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Tait, Brian Steele AstraZeneca, Global Intellectual Property Patents, P.O. Box 272, Mereside, Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4GR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Tait, Brian Steele AstraZeneca, Global Intellectual Property Patents, P.O. Box 272, Mereside, Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4GR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99909099.6 | 16.03.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999GB00787 | Priority number, date | GB19980005866 | 20.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9805866 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9948857 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064253 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064253 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C219/34, A61K31/215, C07D295/12 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
C07D295/135 (EP,US);
C07C219/34 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Extension states | AL | 20.10.2000 | LT | 20.10.2000 | LV | 20.10.2000 | MK | 20.10.2000 | RO | 20.10.2000 | SI | 20.10.2000 | Title | German: | ANTI-TUMOR-MITTEL | [2001/01] | English: | ANTI-TUMOUR AGENTS | [2001/01] | French: | AGENTS ANTITUMORAUX | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 02.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0092136 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]WO9311099 (CANCER RES CAMPAIGN TECH [GB]) [AD] 1,9,10 * page 9 - page 11; claims 1-14 *; | [A] - J. E. WYNN ET AL., "Synthesis and bioevaluation of a series of fatty acid esters of p-(n,n-Bis(2-chloroethyl)amino)phenol", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES., WASHINGTON US, (198207), vol. 71, no. 7, pages 772 - 776, XP002105522 [A] 1,9,10 * page 772 * | [AD] - BRIDGET M. SYKES ET AL., "Kinetics and mechanism of the cyclization of substituted n-phenyl-2-methyl-2-(2-aminophenyl)propanamides and analogues", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 2., LETCHWORTH GB, (1995), pages 337 - 342, XP002105523 [AD] 1,9,10 * the whole document * | [AD] - LOUIS A. CARPINO ET AL., "Reductive lactonization of strategically methylated quinone propionic acid esters and amides", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., EASTON US, (19890707), vol. 54, no. 14, pages 3303 - 3310, XP002105524 [AD] 1,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00275a012 | [AD] - CHIKHALE P ET AL, "TUMOR TARGETED PRODRUGS: REDOX-ACTIVATION OF CONFORMATIONALLY CONSTRAINED, BIOREDUCTIVE MELPHALAN PRODRUGS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 88TH. ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, SAN DIEGO, APR. 12 - 16, 1997, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, (19970412), no. VOL.38, page 432, XP002052354 [AD] 1 |