EP1078550 - ADAPTIVE SCHEDULING METHOD AND APPARATUS TO SERVICE MULTILEVEL QoS IN AAL2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dixit, Sudhir S. 12 Westerly Road Weston, MA 02193 / US | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Simmelvuo, Markku Kalevi, et al Papula Oy ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Simmelvuo, Markku, et al Papula Oy, Patent Agency Papula P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2001/09] | Johansson, Folke Anders Nokia Corporation, P.O. Box 319 00045 Nokia Group / FI | Application number, filing date | 99909543.3 | 22.02.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US03783 | Priority number, date | US19980028241 | 24.02.1998 Original published format: US 28241 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944390 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078550 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1078550 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5651 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5656 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5681 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/09] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE ZUWEISUNGSANLAGE UND-VERFAHREN ZUR BEDIENUNG VON MEHRSTUFIGEN QOS IN DER AAL-2 SCHICHT | [2001/09] | English: | ADAPTIVE SCHEDULING METHOD AND APPARATUS TO SERVICE MULTILEVEL QoS IN AAL2 | [2001/09] | French: | PROCEDE D'ORDONNANCEMENT ADAPTATIF ET APPAREIL DESTINE A APPORTER UNE QUALITE DE SERVICE (QOS) A NIVEAUX MULTIPLES DANS UN AAL2 | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 25.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9748251 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-23 * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 24 * * page 11; table 1 * * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 34 *; | [A]EP0388951 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 11,21 * column 5, line 37 - line 45 *; | [A] - BALDWIN J H ET AL, "AAL-2 - A NEW ATM ADAPTION LAYER FOR SMALL PACKET ENCAPSULATION ANDMULTIPLEXING", BELL LABS TECHNICAL JOURNAL, (19970321), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 111 - 131, XP000695171 [A] 1-23 * page 117, column 1, line 10 - page 120, column 1, line 22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bltj.2051 |