EP1058827 - RANDOM ACCESS SLIDE STAINER WITH INDEPENDENT SLIDE HEATING REGULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cytologix Corporation 99 Erie Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOGEN, Steven, A. 35 Cheryl Drive Sharon, MA 02067 / US | 02 /
LOEFFLER, Herbert, H. 53 Spy Pond Lane Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 03 /
PURBRICK, John, A. 12 Park Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99909619.1 | 25.02.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999US04159 | Priority number, date | US19980032676 | 27.02.1998 Original published format: US 32676 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944032 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058827 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058827 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/31, B01L7/00 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
B01L9/52 (EP,US);
G01N1/312 (EP,US);
G01N35/0092 (EP,US);
G01N35/025 (EP,US);
B01L2200/147 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0822 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1827 (EP,US);
B01L2400/049 (EP,US);
B01L3/0293 (EP,US);
G01N2001/317 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00039 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00049 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00138 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00366 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0093 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
Y10T436/112499 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | OBJEKTTRÄGERFÄRBEVORRICHTUNG MIT WAHLFREIEM ZUGRIFF UND UNABHÄNGIGER OBJEKTTRÄGERHEIZUNGSREGELUNG | [2000/50] | English: | RANDOM ACCESS SLIDE STAINER WITH INDEPENDENT SLIDE HEATING REGULATION | [2000/50] | French: | APPAREIL DE COLORATION DE LAMES A ACCES SELECTIF AVEC REGULATION THERMIQUE INDIVIDUELLE DES LAMES | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 06.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05076534.6 / EP1600759 | EP10183273.1 / EP2278297 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.09.2005 | BE | 07.09.2005 | CH | 07.09.2005 | CY | 07.09.2005 | FI | 07.09.2005 | LI | 07.09.2005 | NL | 07.09.2005 | DK | 07.12.2005 | GR | 07.12.2005 | SE | 07.12.2005 | ES | 18.12.2005 | PT | 07.02.2006 | IE | 27.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 07.09.2005 | |
BE | 07.09.2005 | ||
CH | 07.09.2005 | ||
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
IE | 27.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 07.09.2005 | |
BE | 07.09.2005 | ||
CH | 07.09.2005 | ||
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 07.09.2005 | |
BE | 07.09.2005 | ||
CH | 07.09.2005 | ||
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 07.09.2005 | |
CH | 07.09.2005 | ||
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CH | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
ES | 18.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
SE | 07.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0017766 (GISE HARDO DR FREIHERR VON) [A] 10-12* page 6, line 21 - page 9, line 20 *; | [A]US4858155 (OKAWA DOBSON [US], et al) [A] 10 * abstract *; | [A]US4865986 (COY RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 10 * abstract *; | [A]WO9309486 (HYBAID LTD [GB]) [A] 1,8,13 * page 7, lines 7-15 *; | [YD]US5595707 (COPELAND KEITH G [US], et al) [YD] 1,5,8-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5601141 (GORDON STEVEN J [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,8-13 * column 3, line 31 - column 5, line 57 * |