EP1071480 - Sutures made from absorbable copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/05] | ABSORBABLE COPOLYMERS AND SURGICAL ARTICLES FABRICATED THEFEFROM | ||
[2010/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 60 Middletown Avenue North Haven CT 06473 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 60 Middletown Avenue North Haven, CT 06473 / US | ||
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | ||
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states Andres, John C. 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, CT 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBY, Mark, S. 11 Grace Lane Killingworth, CT 06419 / US | 02 /
JIENG, Ying 8900-108 Autumn Winds Drive Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | 03 /
KOKISH, Lyudmila, K. 462 Grace Trail Lane Orange, CT 06477 / US | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99909646.4 | 25.02.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999US04242 | Priority number, date | US19980030191 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: US 30191 | US19980161606 | 26.09.1998 Original published format: US 161606 | [2002/02] |
Former [2001/05] | US19980030191 | 25.02.1998 | |
US19990161606 | 24.02.1999 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9943364 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1071480 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1071480 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L17/00 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
A61L17/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, SE [2001/05] | Title | German: | Chirurgisches Nahtmaterial hergestellt aus resorbierbaren Copolymeren | [2010/18] | English: | Sutures made from absorbable copolymers | [2010/18] | French: | Sutures faites de copolymers absorbable | [2010/18] |
Former [2001/05] | RESORBIERBARE KOPOLYMERE AND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE CHIRURGISCHE GEGENSTÄNDE | ||
Former [2001/05] | ABSORBABLE COPOLYMERS AND SURGICAL ARTICLES FABRICATED THEFEFROM | ||
Former [2001/05] | COPOLYMERES RESORBABLES ET ARTICLES CHIRURGICAUX FABRIQUES A PARTIR DE CES COPOLYMERES | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 10.11.2010 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | [2011/48] |
Former [2011/35] | SE | 10.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5718716 (KEILMAN KENNETH M ET AL) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 40 - line 55 * * column 2, line 31 - line 64 * * column 3, line 60 - line 64 * * claim - *; | [X]EP0635274 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 48 - line 53 * * page 8, line 42 - line 52 * * claim - *; | [X]US5431679 (LIU CHENG-KUNG ET AL) [X] 14,15 * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 40 * * claim - *; | [X]EP0761712 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS) [X] 14,15 * example 1 * * claim - *; | [X]EP0626404 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP) [X] 14,15 * page 3, line 23 - line 31 * * page 4, line 16 - line 24 * * claim - *; | [A]US5133739 (JAMIOLKOWSKI DENNIS D ET AL) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US3092891 (ENRICO BARATTI) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4700704 (JAMIOLKOWSKI DENNIS D [US], et al) | by applicant | US4700704 |