EP1062333 - CHONDROSARCOMA ASSOCIATED GENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, LU, SE | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODE ISLAND HOSPITAL 593 Eddy Street Providence, RI 02903 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states RHODE ISLAND HOSPITAL 593 Eddy Street Providence, Rhode Island 02903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEREK, Richard, M. 129 Benefit Street, 5 Providence, RI 02903 / US | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2000/52] | Schlich, George William, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99909962.5 | 12.03.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999US05348 | Priority number, date | US19980042225 | 13.03.1998 Original published format: US 42225 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9946382 | Date: | 16.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062333 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062333 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, C12N15/63, G01N33/574 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
C07K14/4748 (EP,US);
G01N33/57407 (EP,US);
G01N33/57496 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | CHONDROSARCOM-ASSOZIIERTE GENE | [2000/52] | English: | CHONDROSARCOMA ASSOCIATED GENES | [2000/52] | French: | GENES ASSOCIES AU CHONDROSARCOME | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.2009 | CY | 12.03.2009 | FI | 12.03.2009 | GB | 12.03.2009 | IE | 12.03.2009 | IT | 12.03.2009 | LU | 12.03.2009 | ES | 13.03.2009 | SE | 13.03.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | DK | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/28] |
Former [2010/44] | AT | 12.03.2009 | |
CY | 12.03.2009 | ||
FI | 12.03.2009 | ||
GB | 12.03.2009 | ||
IE | 12.03.2009 | ||
ES | 13.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
DK | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 12.03.2009 | |
CY | 12.03.2009 | ||
FI | 12.03.2009 | ||
GB | 12.03.2009 | ||
IE | 12.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
DK | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 12.03.2009 | |
FI | 12.03.2009 | ||
GB | 12.03.2009 | ||
IE | 12.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
DK | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 12.03.2009 | |
FI | 12.03.2009 | ||
IE | 12.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | CY | 12.03.2009 | |
FI | 12.03.2009 | ||
IE | 12.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | CY | 12.03.2009 | |
FI | 12.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X] - ROSIER R. ET AL., "P-Glycoprotein Expression in Cartilaginous Tumors", JOURNAL OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY, (199706), vol. 65, no. 2, pages 95 - 105, XP002107280 [X] 1,2,6-8,11-17 * page 98, column 1, line 5 - page 101, column 1, line 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-9098(199706)65:2<95::AID-JSO5>3.0.CO;2-I | [X] - NAKANISHI T. ET AL., "Cloning of a mRNA Preferentially Expressed in Chondrocytes by Differential Display-PCR from a Human Chondrocytic Cell Line That Is Identical with Connective Tissue Growth Factor (CTGF) mRNA", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (19970508), vol. 234, no. 1, pages 206 - 210, XP002106968 [X] 1,2,6-8,11,12 * page 206, column 2, line 20 - line 25; figure 1 * * page 207, column 1, line 1 - line 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1997.6528 | [X] - GLOECKNER G. ET AL., "Genomic Sequence around the CP1 gene; Homo sapiens cosmid, complete sequence", EMBL DATABASE ENTRY HSAF2996;ACCESSION NUMBER AF002996, (19970527), XP002106969 [X] 9 * compare SEQ ID NO:1 to bp 36936-37100 of the cosmid sequence and further compare amino acids 1 - 48 of SEQ ID NO:2 to amino acids 12312 - 12359 of the cosmid sequence * | [X] - LIANG P ET AL, "DIFFERENTIAL DISPLAY OF EUKARYOTIC MESSENGER RNA BY MEANS OF THE POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION", SCIENCE, (19920814), vol. 257, no. 5072, pages 967 - 971, XP000508268 [X] 1,2,6-8 * page 967, column 2, line 9 - line 20 * * page 969, column 3, line 4 - line 39 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1354393 |