EP1064114 - CONTINUOUS CASTING INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING OF A THIN STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE Industrieanlagenbau GmbH Turmstrasse 44 4020 Linz / AT | For all designated states Acciai Speciali Terni S.p.A. Viale Benedetto Brin n. 218 05100 Terni / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH Turmstrasse 44 4020 Linz / AT | ||
For all designated states Acciai Speciali Terni S.p.A. Viale Benedetto Brin n. 218 05100 Terni / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOHENBICHLER, Gerald Mohnstrasse 3 A-4482 Kronstorf / AT | 02 /
PELLISSETTI, Stefano Altenbergerstrasse 5/8/43 A-4040 Linz / AT | 03 /
SCHERTLER, Armin Neudorferstrasse 30 A-2353 Guntramsdorf / AT | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Kopecky, Helmut Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Kopecky, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 32/22 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 99909990.6 | 24.03.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999AT00078 | Priority number, date | AT19980000534 | 25.03.1998 Original published format: AT 53498 | [2001/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9948636 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064114 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064114 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/128, B22D11/20 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
B22D11/0694 (EP,US);
B22D11/128 (KR);
B22D11/0622 (EP,US);
B22D11/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | STRANGGIESSANLAGE ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN GIESSEN EINES DÜNNEN BANDES SOWIE VERFAHREN HIERZU | [2001/01] | English: | CONTINUOUS CASTING INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING OF A THIN STRIP | [2001/01] | French: | INSTALLATION ET PROCEDE DE COULEE EN CONTINU D'UN RUBAN MINCE | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 04.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.2003
07.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE Castrip, LLC 9 Lockerman Street Dover, Delaware, NC 12201 / US Opponent's representative Bertram, Rainer, et al, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.2003
07.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE Castrip, LLC 9 Lockerman Street Dover, Delaware, NC 12201 / US Opponent's representative Bertram, Rainer, et al, et al Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | 10.12.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.03.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.09.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.10.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.11.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/49] | Appeal following opposition | 16.12.2005 | Appeal received No. T1561/05 | 01.03.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.10.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible | 10.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.03.2005 | ES | 26.03.2005 | DK | 31.03.2005 | [2007/22] |
Former [2006/26] | FI | 24.03.2005 | |
DK | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 24.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5484010 (ROUZEVAL ANDRE [FR], et al) [X] 1,5-13,22 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [DX]JPS6330158 ; | [DX]EP0780177 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP], et al) [DX] 1 * column 9, line 45 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [DA]AT402266B (VOEST ALPINE IND ANLAGEN [AT]) [DA] 1-6,9-12 * claims 1,2,14-17,19-21 *; | [A]JPH05309454 ; | [A]DE19542180 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * claims 1,5 *; | [A]DE19637545 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [A] * the whole document * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880706), vol. 012, no. 236, Database accession no. (M - 715), & JP63030158 A 19880208 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [DX] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940224), vol. 018, no. 115, Database accession no. (M - 1566), & JP05309454 A 19931122 (NIPPON STEEL CORP;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,12,22 * abstract * |