EP1064166 - VENTILATING DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLE FUEL TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE DE MATERIEL ET D'EQUIPEMENTS TECHNIQUES C.O.M.E.T. 27, Avenue Etienne Audibert F-60304 Senlis Cedex / FR | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROMANEK, Christian 57, rue de Paris F-60430 Noailles / FR | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99910440.9 | 26.03.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999FR00710 | Priority number, date | FR19980004019 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9804019 | [2001/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9950086 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064166 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064166 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/035, F16K17/36 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
B60K15/03519 (EP,US);
F16K17/36 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0753 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0874 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/01] | Title | German: | ENTLÜFTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN KRAFTSTOFFTANK EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [2001/01] | English: | VENTILATING DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLE FUEL TANK | [2001/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MISE A L'AIR LIBRE POUR UN RESERVOIR DE CARBURANT DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 15.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]FR2740402 (JOURNEE PAUL SA [FR]) [DA] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4756328 (SHERWOOD CARL H [US]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2740402 |