EP0987658 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING PAPER MONEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Nippon Conlux 2-2, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Nippon Conlux 2-2, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUDA, Shigeru 2-22-25-316, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi Saitama 350-2201 / JP | 02 /
ISHIDA, Takeshi 10-4-305, Izunoyamacho Sakado-shi Saitama 350-0275 / JP | 03 /
SAKAMOTO, Yuichi B-404 14-3, Matsukazedai Higashi-Matsuyama-shi Saitama 350-0055 / JP | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | ||
Former [2000/12] | Fiener, Josef Postfach 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99910770.9 | 30.03.1999 | [2000/12] | WO1999JP01623 | Priority number, date | JP19980088720 | 01.04.1998 Original published format: JP 8872098 | [2000/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9950798 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0987658 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0987658 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/00, G07D7/12, B65H7/14 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
G07D7/04 (EP,KR,US);
G07D7/12 (EP,KR,US);
G07D7/17 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/12] | G07D7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM BEHANDELN VON PAPIERGELD | [2000/12] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING PAPER MONEY | [2000/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE PAPIER-MONNAIE | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1999 | Translation filed | 20.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 14.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5084627 (UEKI YOSHIHARU [JP], et al); | [A]GB2279480 (COUNCHINE CO LTD [TW]); | [A]US5437357 (OTA MICHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0699608 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [Y]JPS61229183 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH02193288 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH06111096 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH06139427 (TOYO COMMUNICATION EQUIP) |