EP1071864 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING A TOOL IN A WELLBORE, A TUBULAR AND A DEVICE FOR THE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weatherford/Lamb, Inc. 515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Weatherford/Lamb, Inc. 515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | ||
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states Weatherford/Lamb Inc. CSC - The United States Corporation Company, 1013 Centre Road Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | ||
For all designated states LUCAS, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co., 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGLETON, Teme, Forrest 312 Leona Street Houma, LA 70363 / US | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Harding, Richard Patrick Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99911937.3 | 23.03.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999GB00918 | Priority number, date | US19980162469 | 23.03.1998 Original published format: US 162469 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9949178 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1071864 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1071864 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E21B29/06, E21B23/01, E21B23/00, E21B7/06 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
E21B23/00 (EP,US);
E21B23/006 (EP,US);
E21B23/01 (EP,US);
E21B7/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/05] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINES WERKZEUGES IN EINEM BOHRLOCH, ROHR UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DAS SYSTEM | [2001/05] | English: | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATING A TOOL IN A WELLBORE, A TUBULAR AND A DEVICE FOR THE SYSTEM | [2001/05] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR LOCALISER UN OUTIL DANS UN PUITS DE FORAGE, ET MATERIEL TUBULAIRE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CE SYSTEME | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 04.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 28.05.2003 | [2008/17] | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5531271 (CARTER THURMAN B [US]) [X] 1-8,10,11,20-31 * column 12, line 66 - column 13, line 35 * * column 13, line 58 - line 62 * * column 14, line 39 - column 15, line 8 * * column 15, line 52 - column 16, line 7 * * column 17, line 54 - column 18, line 7 * * column 22, line 45 - line 53 * * column 24, line 58 - column 25, line 21 * * column 26, line 60 - column 27, line 35 * * figures 1-5,9,16,26 * * figures 52B,61,72,74 * * see for instance tubular 12, (very general term )profile 26, key 36,concave 22, friction engaging means 316,1492,197,setting bar 514, flexible member 650,slots in fig. 49,50 * [A] 12-19; | [XA]US5595247 (BRADDICK BRITT O [US]) [X] 1-6,9,14,15,24-31 * column 6, line 18 - line 47 * * column 9, line 63 - column 10, line 19 * * column 12, line 53 - line 65 * * see tubular C, profiles 24, 26, key 90, slot 92, setting tool WSS, shear pin 182;; figures 3,5,6,17 * [A] 7,8 |