EP1058850 - METHOD OF DETECTING AXONAL DAMAGE, ASSOCIATED DISEASE STATES, AND RELATED MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AND PROTEIN CONTROLS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF CINCINNATI 231 Bethesda Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45267 / US | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEMLAN, Frank, P. 7000 Drake Road Cincinnati, OH 45243 / US | 02 /
CAMPBELL, Thomas, A. 9833 Hocking Street Massillon, OH 44646 / US | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99912304.5 | 05.03.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999US04955 | Priority number, date | US19980035708 | 05.03.1998 Original published format: US 35708 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9945393 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058850 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, C07K16/00 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS AXONALER SCHÄDEN, DAMIT VERBUNDENER KRANKHEITSZUSTÄNDE UND DARAUF BEZOGENER MONOKLONALE ANTIKÖRPER UND PROTEINKONTROLLEN DAFÜR | [2000/50] | English: | METHOD OF DETECTING AXONAL DAMAGE, ASSOCIATED DISEASE STATES, AND RELATED MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AND PROTEIN CONTROLS THEREFOR | [2000/50] | French: | METHODE DE DETECTION DE LESIONS AXONIQUES, D'ETATS PATHOLOGIQUES ASSOCIES, ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX ASSOCIES ET ANALYSES DE MESURE DE TAUX DE PROTEINES PREVUES A CET EFFET | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 30.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/32] | 27.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2001 | 31.03.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9303369 (VOORHEIS PAUL H [IE]); | [X]WO9308302 (INNOGENETICS NV [BE]); | [X]WO9311231 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]); | [X]WO9413795 (INNOGENETICS NV [BE], et al); | [X]WO9517429 (INNOGENETICS NV [BE], et al); | [X]WO9604309 (INNOGENETICS NV [BE], et al) |