EP1062624 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SCANNING AND MAPPING A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISC/US Inc. 1965 S.E. 22nd Avenue Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316 / US | [2000/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜCKENDAHL, Lars Memler Strasse 5C D-23843 Bad Oldesloe / DE | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99912509.9 | 16.03.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999US05559 | Priority number, date | US19980078325P | 17.03.1998 Original published format: US 78325 P | US19980080900 | 18.05.1998 Original published format: US 80900 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9948041 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062624 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
G06V40/1312 (EP,US);
G06V10/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCANNEN UND ABBILDEN EINER OBERFLÄCHE | [2000/52] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SCANNING AND MAPPING A SURFACE | [2000/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINE AU BALAYAGE ET AU MAPPAGE D'UNE SURFACE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4641350 (BUNN ROBERT F [US]) [A] 1-82 * abstract *; | [A]US4696046 (SCHILLER MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-82* column 3, line 10 - line 35 * | International search | [X]US4863268 (CLARKE DONALD A [CA], et al); | [XP]US5812252 (BOWKER J KENT [US], et al) |