EP1066106 - REINFORCED, THREE ZONE MICROPOROUS MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB, IE | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states Cuno Incorporated 400 Research Parkway Meriden Connecticut 06450 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYERING, Mark, T. 119 Hubbard Street Middlefield, CT 06455 / US | 02 /
VINING, Jack, H., Jr. 18 Anthony Road Bolton, Connecticut 06043 / US | 03 /
BADENHOP, C., Thomas 55 Cross Highway Westport, CT 06880 / US | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2001/02] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99912536.2 | 17.03.1999 | [2001/02] | WO1999US05626 | Priority number, date | US19980040979 | 18.03.1998 Original published format: US 40979 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947246 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066106 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1066106 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00, B01D71/56, B32B5/22, B32B37/08, B32B37/15, B01D69/02, B01D69/10, B01D69/12, D06N3/04, D06N3/12, B32B37/00 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
B32B37/153 (EP,US);
B01D67/00111 (EP,US);
B01D67/0013 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/107 (EP,US);
B01D69/1071 (EP,US);
B01D69/12 (EP,US);
B01D71/56 (EP,US);
B32B5/22 (EP,US);
D06N3/04 (EP,US);
D06N3/12 (EP,US);
B01D2325/022 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/02] | B01D69/10, B01D69/12, B29C47/02, B29C47/06, B29C47/14 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LU, NL, SE [2016/48] |
Former [2001/02] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKTE MIKROPORÖSE MEMBRAN MIT DREI SCHICHTZONEN | [2015/48] | English: | REINFORCED, THREE ZONE MICROPOROUS MEMBRANE | [2001/02] | French: | MEMBRANE MICROPOREUSE RENFORCEE A TROIS ZONES | [2001/02] |
Former [2001/02] | VERSTÄRKTE MIRKOPORÖSE MEMBRAN MIT DREI SCHICHTZONEN | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2005 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.11.2016 | ES | 30.11.2016 | IT | 30.11.2016 | NL | 30.11.2016 | SE | 30.11.2016 | GB | 17.03.2017 | IE | 17.03.2017 | LU | 17.03.2017 | FR | 31.03.2017 | [2018/13] |
Former [2018/10] | BE | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 17.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | BE | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | BE | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | ES | 30.11.2016 | |
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6076323 ; | [A]US3969548 (HUNTER JACK A, et al); | [XD]US4645602 (BARNES JR ROBERT G [US], et al); | [A]US4844805 (SOLOMON DONALD F [US]); | [A]EP0599791 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]); | [A]US5500167 (DEGEN PETER J [US]); |