EP0980541 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DIRECT WRITING OF SEMICONDUCTOR DIE USING MICROCOLUMN ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states Etec Systems, Inc. 26460 Corporate Avenue Hayward, CA 94545 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGLUND, C., Neil 15361 S. Clackamas River Drive Oregon City, OR 97045 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Tai-Hon, Philip 1105 Nimitz Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99912742.6 | 19.03.1999 | [2000/08] | WO1999US06093 | Priority number, date | US19980045490 | 20.03.1998 Original published format: US 45490 | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947978 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980541 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, H01J37/317 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G03F7/2059 (KR);
H01J37/3177 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
G03F7/2063 (KR);
G03F7/704 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2000/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM DIREKTEN BESCHREIBEN EINER HALBLEITERSCHEIBE MITTELS EINER VIELZAHL VON MIKRO-STRAHLUNGSQUELLEN | [2000/08] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DIRECT WRITING OF SEMICONDUCTOR DIE USING MICROCOLUMN ARRAY | [2000/08] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE GRAVURE DIRECTE DE PUCES DE SEMICONDUCTEUR A L'AIDE D'UN GROUPEMENT DE MICROCOLONNES | [2000/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 01.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 05.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4694178 (HARTE KENNETH J [US]) [Y] 1-5,7,9,11,13-17,19,23 * figure 1 *; | [YD] - CHANG T H P ET AL, "ELECTRON-BEAM MICROCOLUMNS FOR LITHOGRAPHY AND RELATED APPLICATIONS", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B, (19961101), vol. 14, no. 6, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 3774 - 3781, XP000721110 [YD] 1-5,7,9,11,13-17,19,23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.588666 |